Nichols v. Marx et al
Plaintiff: Xylina Nichols
Defendant: United States of Amercia and Christopher D. Marx
Case Number: 3:2019cv00797
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed by Xylina Nichols. United States of Amercia served on 9/30/2019. (Fusner, George)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean Atyia on behalf of Christopher D. Marx, United States of Amercia (Atyia, Dean)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Donald Q. Cochran on 09/24/2019 by Xylina Nichols. (Fusner, George)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Reissued as to Christopher D. Marx, United States of America. Service copies issued to Plaintiff's counsel representative at Intake. (mg) Modified on 9/25/2019 (mg).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/19/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Xylina Nichols. Christopher D. Marx served on 9/19/2019. (Fusner, George)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Xylina Nichols. United States of Amercia served on 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of Delivery)(Fusner, George)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Xylina Nichols. United States of Amercia served on 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of Delivery)(Fusner, George)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed by Xylina Nichols. United States of Amercia served on 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of Delivery)(Fusner, George)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (mg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Xylina Nichols, United States of Amercia, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg) Modified on 9/12/2019 (mg).
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
September 12, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for George R. Fusner, Jr. (mg)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christopher D. Marx, United States of Amercia (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2990733), filed by Xylina Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Marx et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xylina Nichols
Represented By: George R. Fusner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of Amercia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D. Marx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?