Kelley v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence David Kelley
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv00800
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This matter is before the Court on the Parties' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Finding that the parties agree, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that all claims of Plaintiff Lawrence David Kelley brought against Defendants C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated in this case are dismissed in their entirety, without prejudice. Each Party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/2/2019. (jm)
October 2, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Ramsey, Shane)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for November 21, 2019 at 1:45 p.m. is hereby RESET for the same day at 1:00 p.m. It is so ORDERED. ENTER this 1st day of October 2019. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/1/2019. (hb)
September 30, 2019 SC BAR STATUS verified for Attys. Eric A. Paine and Dell P. Chappell. (hb) Modified text on 9/30/2019 (hb).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Eric A. Paine to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 9/27/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Dell P. Chappell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 9/27/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Eric A. Paine to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2999502) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Ramsey, Shane)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney Dell P. Chappell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2999501) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Ramsey, Shane)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Richard B. North, Jr. (North, Richard)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated re #6 Notice of Appearance (Ramsey, Shane)
September 16, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Douglass Alan Kreis, Robert R Luke, and Daniel P Barton: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/7/2019. (jm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 01:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jm)
September 16, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard B. North, Jr: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/7/2019. (jm)
September 16, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Douglass Alan Kreis, Robert R Luke, and Daniel P Barton: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 10/7/2019. (jm)
September 16, 2019 GA State Bar status verified as active for Richard B. North, Jr; TN State Bar status verified as active for Shane G. Ramsey; FL State Bar status verified as active for Douglass Alan Kreis; TX State Bar status verified as active for Robert R Luke and Daniel P Barton. (jm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
September 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane G. Ramsey on behalf of All Defendants (Ramsey, Shane)
September 11, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Middle District of Tennessee via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
February 10, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-0423-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
February 10, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13905141 filed by Lawrence David Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence David Kelley
Represented By: Daniel P Barton
Represented By: Douglass Alan Kreis
Represented By: Robert R Luke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?