Stokes v. TRAX Nashville
Plaintiff: Michael Stokes
Defendant: TRAX Nashville
Case Number: 3:2019cv00809
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Stokes re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File associate with local counsel (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File associate with local counsel. Counsel is ORDERED to file a certificate of service for the motion in compliance with this Court's Local Rules by no later than October 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/10/19. (gb)
October 9, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#12 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (gb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File associate with local counsel by Michael Stokes. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Counsel for Plaintiff Michael Stokes has filed a letter addressed to Chief Judge Crenshaw asking for an extension of time in which to associate with local counsel. Counsel is ORDERED to file its request as a motion in accordance with this Court's Local Rules. The Court will rule on that motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on October 7, 2019. (AN)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Richard Liebowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/7/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File associate with local counsel by Michael Stokes. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Richard Liebowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3006999) by Michael Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Liebowitz, Richard)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael Stokes. TRAX Nashville served on 9/20/2019. (Liebowitz, Richard)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/18/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
September 13, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard P. Liebowitz: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 10/4/2019. (gb)
September 13, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard P. Liebowitz: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/4/2019. (gb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to TRAX Nashville. (gb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initital Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (gb)
September 13, 2019 NY State Bar status verified as active for Richard P. Liebowitz. (gb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TRAX Nashville (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-2991857), filed by Michael Stokes. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - the Photograph, #2 Exhibit B - the Infringing Use, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Attachment Copyright Form)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stokes v. TRAX Nashville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAX Nashville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stokes
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?