Kennedy et al v. Hodges et al
Plaintiff: Justin Kennedy and Astin Hill
Defendant: DCSO and David Hodges
Case Number: 3:2019cv00815
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re: #7 Order. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (dt)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Both applications to proceed in forma pauperis #4 and #5 is Granted. Each plaintiff, Justin Kennedy and Astin Hill, is hereby assessed his portion of the $350 filing fee ($175). The Court has reviewed the complaint pursuant to the PLRA and, for the reasons set forth in the Memorandum entered contemporaneously with this Order, finds that the complaint fails to state Section 1983 claims upon which relief can be granted. Therefore, Plaintiffs' Section 1983 claims against both Defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. This is the final Order denying all relief in this case. The Clerk SHALL enter judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(b). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/8/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. Administrator of inmate trust fund accounts at the Davidson County Sheriff's Office by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/8/2019. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Astin Hill. (dt)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Justin Kennedy. (dt)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Here, neither Plaintiff has submitted an application to proceed in forma pauperis or his portion of the civil filing fee. Therefore, the Clerk is DIRECTED to send each Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis for prisoners. Each Plaintiff, in turn, is DIRECTED to do one of the following within 28 days of the date he receives this Order: either (1) submit to the Court his portion of the civil filing fee ($175); or (2) complete an application to proceed in forma pauperis and return the properly completed application to the district court. Plaintiffs cannot submit a combined application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/20/19. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail w/ IFP form.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 17, 2019 (Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (afs)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (afs)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DCSO, David Hodges, filed by Justin Kennedy, Astin Hill.(afs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy et al v. Hodges et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Astin Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?