Trentham v. Mid-America Apartments, LP
Plaintiff: Robert L. Trentham
Defendant: Mid-America Apartments, LP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00819
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed as to #11 Order Remanding Case. (gb)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re #11 Order Remanding Case to State Court. Sent to Circuit Court for Williamson County. (gb)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The defendants have moved to withdraw their Notice of Removal and requests that the court remand this case to the Circuit Court of Williamson County, Tennessee, from whence it was removed. ( #10 ) This motion is hereby GRANTED, and the Clerk is requested to remand this case to the Circuit Court for Williamson County, Tennessee. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/16/19. (gb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Remand and Motion to Withdraw Notice of Removal by Mid-America Apartments, LP. (Newman, Russell)
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Robert L. Trentham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Copies of Alias Summons Returns, #2 Exhibit 2 - Closing the Snap Removal Loophole Article)(Malone, Gayle)
October 9, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#8 : This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word of WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (gb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand Brief in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by Mid-America Apartments, LP. (Newman, Russell)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mid-America Apartments, LP. (Newman, Russell)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mid-America Apartments, LP. (Newman, Russell)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Robert L. Trentham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Evidence of Mid-America being a Tennessee Corporation)(Malone, Gayle)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 02:15 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (gb)
September 17, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Karl M. Braun, Russell A. Newman, Gayle I. Malone, Jr. and Joseph F. Welborn, III. (gb)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mid-America Apartments, LP from Circuit Court for Williamson County, case number 2019-414. (Filing fee paid $400 receipt number 34675056307) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - FL Drivers License, #3 Exhibit C - Voter Registration, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Last Known Address, #5 Exhibit E - 2015 Schedule K-1, #6 Exhibit F - 2016 Schedule K-1, #7 Exhibit G - 2017 Schedule K-1, #8 Exhibit H - Mid-America Apartments LP's Filing Information, #9 Exhibit I - State Court Answer and Defenses, #10 Exhibit J - State Court Notice of Removal, #11 Exhibit K - Consent to Removal, #12 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Attachment Receipt)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trentham v. Mid-America Apartments, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Trentham
Represented By: Joseph F. Welborn, III
Represented By: Gayle I. Malone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-America Apartments, LP
Represented By: Russell A. Newman
Represented By: Karl M. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?