Shipman et al v. American Medical Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Glenda Shipman and Kenneth Shipman
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., Endo Parmaceuticals Holdings, Inc. and American Medical Systems Holding, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00820
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for attorney Stephen J. McConnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3032769) by American Medical Systems Holding, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., Astora Women's Health, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing for Stephen J. McConnell)(King, Rocklan)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Scholastica N.S. Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 11/15/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Kerry L. Bundy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 11/15/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
November 12, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Filing by Boston Scientific Corporation re #32 MOTION for attorney Kerry L. Bundy to Appear Pro Hac Vice as additional counsel for Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3027000), Annotation - Deficiency Notice,, #33 MOTION for attorney Scholastica N.S. Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice as additional counsel for Defendant Boston Scientific Corporaion (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3027003) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Statement Under Oath of Kerry L. Bundy, #2 Attachment Statement Under Oath of S. Baker)(Felker, Samuel)
November 7, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# [32 & 33]: By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney, and if so, providing complete details about the proceeding or charges, including outcome. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (jm)
November 7, 2019 MN State Bar status verified as active for Scholastica N.S. Baker and Kerry L. Bundy. (jm)
November 6, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for attorney Scholastica N.S. Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice as additional counsel for Defendant Boston Scientific Corporaion (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3027003) by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for S. Baker)(Felker, Samuel)
November 6, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for attorney Kerry L. Bundy to Appear Pro Hac Vice as additional counsel for Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3027000) by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for K. Bundy)(Felker, Samuel)
November 4, 2019 Filing 31 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Felker, Samuel)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Supplemental Motion for Ben C. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 11/1/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Ben C. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/31/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 30, 2019 Filing 28 Supplemental MOTION for attorney Ben C. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid - see DE #19 ) by Glenda Shipman, Kenneth Shipman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing of Ben C. Martin)(Toll, Alisha) Modified on 11/1/2019 (jm).
October 29, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation re Annotation - Deficiency Notice, #25 Answer to Amended Complaint (Felker, Samuel)
October 29, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#25 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (jm)
October 29, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Rocklan W. King, III, Cannon F. Allen, Samuel Lanier Felker, and Sarah D. Murray. (jm)
October 29, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#19 : The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney, and if so, providing complete details about the proceeding or charges, including outcome. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (jm)
October 29, 2019 TX State Bar status verified as active for Ben C. Martin. (jm)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/28/2019. (jm) Modified on 10/29/2019 (jm).
October 28, 2019 Filing 25 Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation's ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by Boston Scientific Corporation.(Felker, Samuel)
October 28, 2019 Filing 24 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . (Allen, Cannon)
October 28, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by American Medical Systems Holding, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., Astora Women's Health, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Allen, Cannon)
October 28, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED DOCUMENT by American Medical Systems Holding, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., Astora Women's Health, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Amendment to #20 Notice of Appearance . (Allen, Cannon)
October 28, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED DOCUMENT by American Medical Systems Holding, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., Astora Women's Health, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Amendment to #16 Notice of Appearance . (King, Rocklan)
October 23, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Cannon F. Allen on behalf of All Defendants (Allen, Cannon)
October 23, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney Ben C. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3016950) by Glenda Shipman, Kenneth Shipman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing of Ben C. Martin)(Toll, Alisha)
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS returned executed by Glenda Shipman, Kenneth Shipman. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 10/15/2019. (Toll, Alisha)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Laura J. Baughman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/23/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Rocklan W. King, III on behalf of All Defendants (King, Rocklan)
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Laura J. Baughman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3015954) by Glenda Shipman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Baughman, Laura)
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed by Glenda Shipman, Kenneth Shipman. American Medical Systems Holding, Inc. served on 10/8/2019. (Toll, Alisha)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed by Glenda Shipman, Kenneth Shipman. American Medical Systems, Inc. served on 10/8/2019. (Toll, Alisha)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Glenda Shipman, Kenneth Shipman. Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc. served on 10/8/2019. (Toll, Alisha)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Glenda Shipman, Kenneth Shipman. Astora Women's Health, LLC served on 10/8/2019. (Toll, Alisha)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Glenda Shipman, Kenneth Shipman. Endo Health Solutions, Inc. served on 10/8/2019. (Toll, Alisha)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Glenda Shipman, Kenneth Shipman. Boston Scientific Corporation served on 10/7/2019. (Toll, Alisha)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 Summons issued as to American Medical Systems Holding, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., Astora Women's Health, LLC, Boston Scientific Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Service packets sent to Attorney by regular mail.) (am)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Glenda Shipman, Kenneth Shipman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Summons - American Medical Systems, #2 Attachment Summons - American Medical Systems Holdings, #3 Attachment Summons - Astora Women's Health, #4 Attachment Summons - Endo Pharmaceuticals, #5 Attachment Summons - Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, #6 Attachment Summons - Endo Health Solutions, #7 Attachment Summons - Boston Scientific)(Toll, Alisha)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/23/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/20/2019) (dt). Modified on 9/20/2019 (dt).
September 19, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Alisha M. Toll. TX State Bar status verified as active for Ben C. Martin and Laura J. Baughman. (dt)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to American Medical Systems Holding, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2994541), filed by Glenda Shipman, Kenneth Shipman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shipman et al v. American Medical Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Parmaceuticals Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Shipman
Represented By: Alisha M. Toll
Represented By: Laura J. Baughman
Represented By: Ben C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Shipman
Represented By: Alisha M. Toll
Represented By: Laura J. Baughman
Represented By: Ben C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?