Novatne v. Elrod et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Christopher Novatne
Defendant: RCADC, J. Miler, f/n/u Edgell, f/n/u Flipovich, f/n/u Batzell, f/n/u Elrod and f/n/u Cairo
Case Number: 3:2019cv00821
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to be Housed at a Different Location filed by Stephen Christopher Novatne. (jm) Modified on 11/14/2019 (jm).
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Stephen Christopher Novatne. (jm)
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Stephen Christopher Novatne regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge form. (jm)
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Stephen Christopher Novatne requesting subpoena for video footage, subpoena for officer, and to appoint legal counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supporting Documentation, #2 Exhibit B - Supporting Documentation)(jm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Stephen Christopher Novatne re concerns at jail where housed. (xc: Docket sheet sent to pro se party by regular mail.) (jm)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Stephen Novtane requesting documents and to add defendants. (xc: Docket sent to pro se party by regular mail.) (jm)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Subpoena of Records filed by Stephen Christopher Novatne. (jm)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Stephen Christopher Novatne. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Supporting Documentation, #2 Attachment Mailing Envelope)(jm)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Long Form) by Stephen Christopher Novatne. (am)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Stephen Christopher Novatne. (am)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Stephen Christopher Novatne. (am)
September 17, 2019 (Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (afs)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (afs)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Stephen Christopher Novatne. (afs)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against f/n/u Batzell, f/n/u Cairo, f/n/u Edgell, f/n/u Elrod, f/n/u Flipovich, J. Miler, RCADC, filed by Stephen Christopher Novatne.(afs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novatne v. Elrod et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCADC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Miler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Edgell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Flipovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Batzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Elrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Cairo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Christopher Novatne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?