Conley v. John Wiley & Sons, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Conley
Defendant: John Wiley & Sons, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00822
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike -- MOTION TO STRIKE JOHN CONLEY'S REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Crossville Med. Oncology, P.C. v. Glenwood Sys.)(Scales, William)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AGREED ORDER: It appearing to the Court that agreement has been reached to allow Respondent additional time within which to plead or otherwise defend, It is therefore ORDERED that Respondent shall be and is granted through and including November 12, 2019, within which to plead or otherwise defend. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/28/2019. (am)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer John Wiley & Sons, Inc. answer due 11/12/2019. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/28/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 28, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Alvin Scott Derrick, William C. Scales, Jr. (am)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. (Derrick, Alvin)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND by John Wiley & Sons, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Agreed Order)(Derrick, Alvin) Modified Text on 10/28/2019 (am).
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William C. Scales, Jr on behalf of John Wiley & Sons, Inc. (Scales, William)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alvin Scott Derrick on behalf of John Wiley & Sons, Inc. (Derrick, Alvin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed by John Conley. John Wiley & Sons, Inc. served on 10/7/2019. (McKellar, Andrea)
September 18, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Andrea T. McKellar. (am)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to John Wiley & Sons, Inc. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT against John Wiley & Sons, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2995046), filed by John Conley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Partial Final Award (Liability Phase), #2 Exhibit - Final Award, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am) Modified Text on 9/18/2019 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conley v. John Wiley & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wiley & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Alvin Scott Derrick
Represented By: William C. Scales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Conley
Represented By: Andrea T. McKellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?