Allstate Insurance Company v. United States Postal Service et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Richard Russell and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 3:2019cv00827
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: In light of the Joint Notice of Compromise and Settlement filed in this matter on September 27, 2019 ( #7 ) the case management conference in this matter scheduled for Tuesday, November 19, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/15/19. (gb)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal by United States of America. (Atyia, Dean)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Substitute Party. The United States of America is now the named Defendant in place of Defendants Richard Russell and United States Postal Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/1/2019. (mg)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement - JOINT by Richard Russell, United States Postal Service (Atyia, Dean)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE re #5 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Richard Russell, United States Postal Service. (Atyia, Dean)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Substitute Party by Richard Russell, United States Postal Service. (Atyia, Dean)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/24/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
September 20, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Bill Sloan: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 10/11/2019. (mg)
September 20, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Chelsea Danielle Nicholson, and William Sloan. (mg)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Postal Service from General Sessions Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 19GC18660. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Davidson County GS Civil Warrant, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Dean Atyia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Chelsea Danielle Nicholson
Represented By: Bill Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?