In re Nissan North America, Inc. Litigation
Plaintiff: Cathy Bashaw, Robert Garneau, Lisa Hendrickson, Rhonda Perry, Jane Reeves, Nancy Housell, Jeffrey Olkowski, Courtney Johnson and Scott Reeves
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc. and Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Consolidated Plaintiff: David Turner and VAUGHN KERKORIAN
Case Number: 3:2019cv00843
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference RESET for 12/2/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (hb)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #115 Motion for James Mitchell Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/31/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 30, 2019 AL State Bar status verified as active for James Mitchell Williams. (am)
October 29, 2019 Filing 115 MOTION for attorney James Mitchell Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3021231) by Cathy Bashaw, Robert Garneau, Lisa Hendrickson, Nancy Housell, Courtney Johnson, VAUGHN KERKORIAN, Jeffrey Olkowski, Rhonda Perry, Jane Reeves, Scott Reeves, David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of James Mitchell Williams in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stranch, James)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER: The Initial Case Management Conference in this matter is currently scheduled for November 26, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. due to a conflict the conference is reset for December 2, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. in courtroom 783, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee. The proposed case management order shall be submitted electronically with the Court THREE (3) business days before the Initial Case Management Conference and counsel shall also email a Word version copy to chambers at frensleychambers@tnmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/29/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER: Pending before the Court is a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by the Plaintiffs as to Plaintiff Cathy Bashaw (Doc. No. 112). The Plaintiffs cite Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, but that rule applies to the dismissal of actions, not only some claims or parties. The Court construes the Motion as a motion to nonsuit Plaintiff Bashaw's claims and thereby be removed from this action. Accordingly, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21, the Court DISMISSES Plaintiff Cathy Bashaw from this action. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/24/2019. (am)
October 23, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cathy Bashaw (Stranch, James)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #106 Motion for Jaimie Mak to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/21/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #105 Motion for Kim Richman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/21/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 18, 2019 State Bar status verified as active for (CA) Jaimie Mak, (DC) Kim E. Richman. (am)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #97 Motion for Adam J. Levitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/17/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #96 Motion for Daniel R. Ferri to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/17/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #93 Motion for S. Vance Wittie to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/17/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 16, 2019 Filing 106 MOTION for attorney Jaimie Mak to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3013211) by Cathy Bashaw, Robert Garneau, Lisa Hendrickson, Nancy Housell, Courtney Johnson, VAUGHN KERKORIAN, Jeffrey Olkowski, Rhonda Perry, Jane Reeves, Scott Reeves, David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jaimie Mak in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stranch, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 105 MOTION for attorney Kim Richman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3013208) by Cathy Bashaw, Robert Garneau, Lisa Hendrickson, Nancy Housell, Courtney Johnson, VAUGHN KERKORIAN, Jeffrey Olkowski, Rhonda Perry, Jane Reeves, Scott Reeves, David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Kim Richman in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stranch, James)
October 16, 2019 State Bar status verified as active for (IL) Adam J. Levitt, (TN) Brigid M. Carpenter, (TX) S. Vance Wittie, (IL) Daniel R. Ferri. (am)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #95 Motion for John. E. Tangren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/16/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Paul Jeffrey Riehle to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/16/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #92 Motion for Matthew Jacob Adler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/16/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #91 Motion for E. Paul Cauley, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/16/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #89 Motion for L. Timothy Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/16/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #88 Motion for Joel D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/16/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #87 Motion for Frederick J. Klorczyk, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/16/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 97 MOTION for attorney Adam J. Levitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3012254) by Cathy Bashaw, Robert Garneau, Lisa Hendrickson, Nancy Housell, Courtney Johnson, VAUGHN KERKORIAN, Jeffrey Olkowski, Rhonda Perry, Jane Reeves, Scott Reeves, David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Adam J. Levitt in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stranch, James)
October 15, 2019 Filing 96 MOTION for attorney Daniel R. Ferri to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3012239) by Cathy Bashaw, Robert Garneau, Lisa Hendrickson, Nancy Housell, Courtney Johnson, VAUGHN KERKORIAN, Jeffrey Olkowski, Rhonda Perry, Jane Reeves, Scott Reeves, David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Daniel R. Ferri in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stranch, James)
October 15, 2019 Filing 95 MOTION for attorney John. E. Tangren to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3012235) by Cathy Bashaw, Robert Garneau, Lisa Hendrickson, Nancy Housell, Courtney Johnson, VAUGHN KERKORIAN, Jeffrey Olkowski, Rhonda Perry, Jane Reeves, Scott Reeves, David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of John E. Tangren in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stranch, James)
October 15, 2019 Filing 94 MOTION for attorney Paul Jeffrey Riehle to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3012200) by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Carpenter, Brigid)
October 15, 2019 Filing 93 MOTION for attorney S. Vance Wittie to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3012197) by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Carpenter, Brigid)
October 15, 2019 Filing 92 MOTION for attorney Matthew Jacob Adler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3012193) by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Carpenter, Brigid)
October 15, 2019 Filing 91 MOTION for attorney E. Paul Cauley, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3012188) by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Carpenter, Brigid)
October 15, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Brigid M. Carpenter on behalf of All Defendants (Carpenter, Brigid)
October 15, 2019 Filing 89 MOTION for attorney L. Timothy Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3011691) by Cathy Bashaw, Robert Garneau, Lisa Hendrickson, Nancy Housell, Courtney Johnson, VAUGHN KERKORIAN, Jeffrey Olkowski, Rhonda Perry, Jane Reeves, Scott Reeves, David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stranch, James)
October 15, 2019 Filing 88 MOTION for attorney Joel D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3011687) by Cathy Bashaw, Robert Garneau, Lisa Hendrickson, Nancy Housell, Courtney Johnson, VAUGHN KERKORIAN, Jeffrey Olkowski, Rhonda Perry, Jane Reeves, Scott Reeves, David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Joel D. Smith in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stranch, James)
October 15, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION for attorney Frederick J. Klorczyk, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3011682) by Cathy Bashaw, Robert Garneau, Lisa Hendrickson, Nancy Housell, Courtney Johnson, VAUGHN KERKORIAN, Jeffrey Olkowski, Rhonda Perry, Jane Reeves, Scott Reeves, David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Frederick J. Klorczyk, III in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stranch, James)
October 15, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Benjamin A. Gastel. (am)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #84 Motion for H. Clay Barnett, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/15/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #83 Motion for W. Daniel "Dee" Miles, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/15/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 14, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION for attorney H. Clay Barnett, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3011398) by Cathy Bashaw, Robert Garneau, Lisa Hendrickson, Nancy Housell, Courtney Johnson, VAUGHN KERKORIAN, Jeffrey Olkowski, Rhonda Perry, Jane Reeves, Scott Reeves, David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of H. Clay Barnett, III n Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stranch, James)
October 14, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION for attorney W. Daniel "Dee" Miles, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3011397) by Cathy Bashaw, Robert Garneau, Lisa Hendrickson, Nancy Housell, Courtney Johnson, VAUGHN KERKORIAN, Jeffrey Olkowski, Rhonda Perry, Jane Reeves, Scott Reeves, David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of W. Daniel "Dee" Miles, III in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stranch, James)
October 14, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin A. Gastel on behalf of Robert Garneau, Lisa Hendrickson, Nancy Housell, Courtney Johnson, VAUGHN KERKORIAN, Jeffrey Olkowski, Rhonda Perry, Jane Reeves, Scott Reeves, David Turner (Gastel, Benjamin)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Benjamin L. Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/14/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #74 Motion for Michael L. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/14/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #73 Motion for Jonathan D. Boggs to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/14/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 11, 2019 Filing 78 RECEIPT #34675056607 in the amount of $100.00 posted by VAUGHN KERKORIAN, David Turner re #74 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (am)
October 11, 2019 Filing 77 RECEIPT #34675056606 in the amount of $100.00 posted by VAUGHN KERKORIAN, David Turner re #73 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (am)
October 11, 2019 Filing 76 RECEIPT #34675056605 in the amount of $100.00 posted by VAUGHN KERKORIAN, David Turner re #75 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (am)
October 11, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION for attorney Benjamin L. Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid) by VAUGHN KERKORIAN, David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(am)
October 11, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION for attorney Michael L. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid) by VAUGHN KERKORIAN, David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(am)
October 11, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION for attorney Jonathan D. Boggs to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid) by VAUGHN KERKORIAN, David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(am)
October 10, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for James Gerard Stranch, IV. (am)
October 9, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by James Gerard Stranch, IV on behalf of Robert Garneau, Lisa Hendrickson, Nancy Housell, Courtney Johnson, VAUGHN KERKORIAN, Jeffrey Olkowski, Rhonda Perry, Jane Reeves, Scott Reeves, David Turner (Stranch, James)
September 27, 2019 State Bar status verified as active for (CA) Lawrence Timothy Fisher, (CA) Frederick J. Klorczyk, III, (CA) Joel Dashiell Smith, (WV) Benjamin L. Bailey, (NY) Daniel A. Schlanger, (AL) H. Clay Barnett, III, (WV) Jonathan D. Boggs, (WV) Michael L. Murphy, (AL) W. Daniel Miles, III, (IL) John E. Tangren, (CA) Paul Jeffrey Riehle, (CA) Matthew Jacob Adler, (TX) E. Paul Cauley, Jr. (am)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/26/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 24, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (am)
September 24, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Lawrence Timothy Fisher, Frederick J. Klorczyk, III, Joel Dashiell Smith, Benjamin L. Bailey, Daniel A. Schlanger, H. Clay Barnett, III, Jaimie Mak, Jonathan D. Boggs, Michael L. Murphy, W. Daniel Miles, III, John E. Tangren, Paul Jeffrey Riehle, Matthew Jacob Adler, E. Paul Cauley, Jr: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 10/15/2019. (am)
September 24, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Lawrence Timothy Fisher, Frederick J. Klorczyk, III, Joel Dashiell Smith, Benjamin L. Bailey, Daniel A. Schlanger, H. Clay Barnett, III, Jaimie Mak, Jonathan D. Boggs, Michael L. Murphy, W. Daniel Miles, III, John E. Tangren, Paul Jeffrey Riehle, Matthew Jacob Adler, E. Paul Cauley, Jr: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/15/2019. (am)
September 24, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
September 24, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
September 24, 2019 Filing 67 Case transferred in from the District of California Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-07292. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Nissan North America, Inc. Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Bashaw
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Frederick J. Klorczyk, III
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Garneau
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Hendrickson
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Perry
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Reeves
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Housell
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Olkowski
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Johnson
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Reeves
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: David Turner
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Benjamin L. Bailey
Represented By: Jonathan D. Boggs
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: Michael L. Murphy
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Daniel A. Schlanger
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: VAUGHN KERKORIAN
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Benjamin L. Bailey
Represented By: Jonathan D. Boggs
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: Jaimie Mak
Represented By: Michael L. Murphy
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Daniel A. Schlanger
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: E. Paul Cauley, Jr.
Represented By: Paul Jeffrey Riehle
Represented By: Matthew Jacob Adler
Represented By: Daniel R. Ferri
Represented By: James Mitchell Williams
Represented By: Brigid M. Carpenter
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: S. Vance Wittie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Paul Jeffrey Riehle
Represented By: E. Paul Cauley, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Jacob Adler
Represented By: Daniel R. Ferri
Represented By: James Mitchell Williams
Represented By: Brigid M. Carpenter
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: S. Vance Wittie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?