Nouri et al v. United Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ali Reza Nouri and Maryam Rivaz
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00853
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Accordingly, Defendant United Airlines' motion for a more definite statement (Doc. No. 6) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Nouri and Rivaz are ORDERED to file an amended complaint by December 4, 2019, that sets forth all of their claims for relief, including the facts supporting each claim, and complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Nouri and Rivaz are warned that failure to comply with this Order may result in a recommendation that their claims be dismissed for failure to prosecute under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/7/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Pro se plaintiffs Ali Reza Nouri and Maryam Rivaz brought suit against United Airlines, Inc. in the General Sessions Court of Davidson County, Tennessee. United Airlines, Inc. removed the case to this Court under 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1441 and 1446 on the basis of federal question jurisdiction. United Airlines, Inc. paid the filing fee of $400.00. This action is REFERRED to the magistrate judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/21/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (am)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of File Exhibit by Ali Reza Nouri, Maryam Rivaz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Explain the Situation, #2 Exhibit B - Emial to United Airline and Attorney, #3 Exhibit C - Complain the case to BBB, #4 Exhibit D - Receipts for tickets from Turkey to Tehran, #5 Exhibit E - Receipt for file the Complaint, #6 Exhibit F - Hotel Expenses Receipt, #7 Exhibit G - Turkish Expenses Receipts, #8 Exhibit H - Iran Expenses Receipts, #9 Exhibit I - Change Flight Cost)(am)
October 7, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (am)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of #5 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by United Airlines, Inc. . (Rouse, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for More Definite Statement by United Airlines, Inc.. (Rouse, John)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (Rouse, John)
September 27, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for John T. Rouse, Joseph V. Ronderos, Jr. (am)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Airlines, Inc. from General Sessions Court of Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 19GC17316. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3001691) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court File, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nouri et al v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: John T. Rouse
Represented By: Joseph V. Ronderos, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Reza Nouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryam Rivaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?