CBX Law, LLC v. Lexikon Services, LLC
Plaintiff: CBX Law, LLC
Defendant: Lexikon Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00867
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by CBX Law, LLC. (Funk, Samuel)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Lexikon Services, LLC. (Wills, Bennett)
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lexikon Services, LLC. (Wills, Bennett)
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by CBX Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Website Screenshot, #2 Exhibit B - Website re: Texas, #3 Exhibit C - Website re: National)(Funk, Samuel)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Expedited Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/15/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by CBX Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Discovery Requests, #2 Exhibit B - Federal Discovery Requests)(Funk, Samuel)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lexikon Services, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A. Declaration of Michael Murphy)(Wills, Bennett)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Lexikon Services, LLC. (Wills, Bennett)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CBX Law, LLC. (Schuette, D.)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lexikon Services, LLC. (Wills, Bennett)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/2/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
October 1, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Samuel P. Funk, D. Gil Schuette, Bennett James Wills, and Brian T. Boyd. (mg)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lexikon Services, LLC from Chancery Court of Williamson County, Tennessee, case number 48663M. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3003010) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice to Clerk of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3- Notice to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CBX Law, LLC v. Lexikon Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexikon Services, LLC
Represented By: Brian T. Boyd
Represented By: Bennett James Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CBX Law, LLC
Represented By: D. Gil Schuette
Represented By: Samuel P. Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?