Rhodes et al v. Rhodes Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Silvers, Lea Anne Spradlen and Roger Rhodes
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Beverly Sackler, Allergan Sales, LLC, Richard S. Sackler, AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Allergan PLC, Impax Laboratories, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Theresa Sackler, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., David A. Sackler, AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Actavis, LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Technologies, Inc., KVK-Tech, Inc., Kathe A. Sackler, Specgx LLC, Jonathan D. Sackler, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Plc,, Allergan USA, Inc. and Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00885
Filed: October 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: This case is pending transfer to an MDL in the Northern District of Ohio, and the deadline for the filing of responsive pleadings has been extended pending a decision on the transfer. It is therefore ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for December 9, 2019 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, by later order of the court. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/2/2019. (am)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Andrew J. O'Connor and Brien T. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/2/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Andrew J. O'Connor; Brien T. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3040548) by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Declaration of Andrew J. O'Connor, #2 Attachment - Declaration of Brien T. O'Connor, #3 Attachment - Proposed Order)(Zeigler, Jessalyn)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Noramco, Inc. to Answer #1 Complaint. Extensions as requested. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/14/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on behalf of Noramco, Inc. by Roger Rhodes, Anthony Silvers, Lea Anne Spradlen. (Jessee, Thomas)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #1 Complaint #11 GRANTED for extensions as requested. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/8/19. (dt)
November 8, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Andrew J. O'Connor and Brien T. O'Connor: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/29/2019. (dt)
November 8, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jessalyn H. Zeigler and Sarah Byer Miller. MA State Bar status verified as active for Brien T. O'Connor and Andrew J. O'Connor. (dt)
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Zeigler, Jessalyn)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: CORRECTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer #8 is GRANTED for extensions as requested. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/4/19. (dt)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Complaint. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/4/19. (dt)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed (Corrected) by Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc.. (Vlahos, Chris)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc.. (Vlahos, Chris)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Allergan Finance LLC and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.. (dt)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 1:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Impax Laboratories, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, KVK-Tech, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt Plc,, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Specgx LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
October 8, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Gordon Ball and Thomas C. Jessee: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 10/29/2019. (dt)
October 8, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gordon Ball and Thomas C. Jessee. (dt)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
October 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis, LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Impax Laboratories, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, KVK-Tech, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt Plc,, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Rhodes Technologies, Inc., Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Specgx LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC and Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3007012), filed by Lea Anne Spradlen, Roger Rhodes, Anthony Silvers. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhodes et al v. Rhodes Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Represented By: Chris L. Vlahos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Represented By: Jessalyn H. Zeigler
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Chris L. Vlahos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Chris L. Vlahos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Represented By: Jessalyn H. Zeigler
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Plc,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Chris L. Vlahos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Silvers
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Thomas C. Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lea Anne Spradlen
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Thomas C. Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Rhodes
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Thomas C. Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?