Weber v. Renfro et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Weber
Defendant: Michael Zblewski, James Renfro, Energy Resource Fund I, LLC, Tunnul Holdings, Inc., Matthew Harrison, Thomas Talashek and Joseph Ullman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00896
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 61 DECLARATION of James R. Renfro filed by James Renfro re: #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #60 Memorandum in Support. (mg)
May 18, 2020 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Support of #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by James Renfro. (mg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2020: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter dated August 19, 2018, #2 Exhibit 2 - Capital Contribution, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter dated June 21, 2018, #4 Exhibit 4 - Letter dated May 18, 2018, #5 Exhibit 5 - PURCHASE AND SALE AGREEMENT, #6 Exhibit 6 - Letter dated July 9, 2018, #7 Exhibit 7 - CONSULTING SERVICES ENGAGEMENT LETTER, #8 Exhibit 8 - Rowan Law Firm Letter dated August 7, 2018, #9 Exhibit 9 - Fri, Apri 27, 2018 Email, #10 Exhibit 10 - Form 401-A Acceptance of Appointment, #11 Exhibit 11 - Certificate of Fact, #12 Exhibit 12 - Wed, May 16, 2018 Email Communication, #13 Exhibit 13 - Thu, May, 24 2018 Email Communication, #14 Exhibit 14 - Thur, May 31, 2018 Email Communication, #15 Exhibit 15 - Email Communication, #16 Exhibit 16 - Email Communication, #17 Exhibit 17 - ENERGY RESOURCE FUND L LLC, Anti Money Laundering Policies & Procedures, #18 Exhibit 18 - Rowan Law Firm letter dated August 15, 2018, #19 Exhibit 19 - ENERGY RESOURCE FUND I, LLCPRIVATE PLACEMENT MEMORANDUM, #20 Exhibit 20 - Sat, Aug 18, 2018 Email Communication, #21 Exhibit 21 - Email Communication, #22 Exhibit 22 - Email Communication, #23 Exhibit 23 - KBRA Letter dated September 24, 2018, #24 Exhibit 24 - Rowan Law Firm Letter dated October 2, 2018, #25 Exhibit 25 - Email Communication, #26 Exhibit 26 - Email Communication, #27 Exhibit 27 - Email Communication, #28 Exhibit 28 - Email Communication, #29 Exhibit 29 - Email Communication, Mon, Oct 22, 2018, #30 Exhibit 30 - Rowan Law Firm Letter dated October 24, 2018, #31 Exhibit 31 - Email Communication, Friday, November 2, 2018, #32 Exhibit 32 - TUNNUL Letter dated November 7, 2018, #33 Exhibit 33 - Email Communication, #34 Exhibit 34 - Email Communication, Mon, Nov 19, 2018) (mg). Modified on 5/19/2020 (mg).
May 18, 2020 Filing 59 JAMES R. RENFROM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, For Failure to State a Claim, and for Failure to Join a Party by James Renfro. (mg)
May 8, 2020 Filing 58 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed as to #46 Order on Motion for Entry of Default. (mg)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: The motion (Docket Entry No. #55 ) of Defendant James. R. Renfro, who is acting pro se, for leave to file a motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Defendant Renfro is given until May 22, 2020, to file a motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 5/1/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
April 30, 2020 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re #55 MOTION for Leave to file Motion to Dismiss filed by Andrew Weber. (Fox, Grace)
April 20, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to file a Motion to Dismiss by James Renfro. (mg) Modified on 4/21/2020 (mg).
April 20, 2020 Filing 54 REPLY to Response to re #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Tunnul Holdings, Inc., Joseph Ullman, Michael Zblewski. (Cothern, Jeremy)
April 13, 2020 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Andrew Weber. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Andrew Weber)(Fox, Grace)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: Motion #50 GRANTED for a Brief Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss up to and including April 13, 2020. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/26/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (mg)
March 25, 2020 Filing 51 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re #46 Order on Motion for Entry of Default re Defendant Energy Resource Fund I, LLC. (mg)
March 23, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Andrew Weber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendant's Initial Disclosures)(Fox, Grace)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: Pending before the Court is the parties' joint motion to clarify case management order (Docket No. #48 ), which, as discussed in more detail below, is GRANTED and the deadline for Plaintiff's response to the pending motion to dismiss (Docket No. #32 ) is March 30, 2020. Further, to clarify the scope of discovery in the Initial Case Management Order, discovery between the parties other than the Tunnul Defendants and with third parties may proceed. All other case management deadlines and provisions found in prior orders and not modified herein remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/23/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
March 20, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION to Clarify re #45 Case Management Order, by Andrew Weber. (Peal, Robert) Modified on 3/23/2020 (mg).
March 20, 2020 Filing 47 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tunnul Holdings, Inc.. (Hill, Elizabeth)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #43 Request for Entry of Default. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 3/20/20. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail as well as by certified mail Energy Resource Fund I, LLC to the address on the Summons in Docket Entry No. #23 .) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) Modified on 3/23/2020 (mg). Modified on 3/24/2020 (mg).
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: The schedule for completion of discovery is RESERVED; the deadline for filing motions to amend or add parties is RESERVED; and the scheduling for filing and briefing other dispositive motions is RESERVED. Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 10/16/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/20/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
March 19, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Elizabeth M. Hill. (mg)
March 18, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth M. Hill on behalf of Tunnul Holdings, Inc., Joseph Ullman, Michael Zblewski (Hill, Elizabeth)
March 3, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Energy Resource Fund I, LLC by Andrew Weber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Robert A. Peal)(Peal, Robert)
February 27, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/27/2020; ORDER to enter. (Tape #digital recording.) (Hearing lasted 1:27)(jwc)
February 24, 2020 Filing 42 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Andrew Weber. (Peal, Robert)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: By Order entered by Judge Campbell on February 13, 2020, Plaintiff was granted an extension to March 6, 2020 to respond. Otherwise Local Rule 7.01 shall apply. The Clerk of Court shall forward this motion and any responsive filings for the District Judge's consideration. All previously imposed deadlines remain in effect absent further order of the Court, including the February 27, 2020, initial case management conference. The motion of counsel for Defendant Matthew Harrison filed on February 14, 2020, Docket Entry No. #40 , for leave to appear by telephone at the initial case management conference is DENIED. However, the Court will excuse Mr. Harrison's attendance provided Mr. Warth is fully updated on the case and has Mr. Harrison's calendar available for scheduling purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 2/20/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
February 14, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear For Telephonic Appearance of Craig A. Harris by Matthew Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Harris, Craig)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granted #38 Motion for an Extension of Time to File Response. Response due by March 6, 2020. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/13/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (mg)
February 11, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #33 Memorandum in Support by Andrew Weber. (Peal, Robert)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendant Michael Zblewski's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default. (Doc. No. #34 ). For good cause shown, the Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default (Doc. No. #34 ) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/7/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss or Answer the First Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/4/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
February 4, 2020 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Support of #34 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Michael Zblewski . (Cothern, Jeremy)
February 4, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Michael Zblewski. (Cothern, Jeremy)
January 31, 2020 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support of #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Tunnul Holdings, Inc., Joseph Ullman . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joseph Ullman's Declaration)(Cothern, Jeremy)
January 31, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Tunnul Holdings, Inc., Joseph Ullman. (Cothern, Jeremy)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Entry of Default as to Defendant Thomas Talashek and Defendant Michael Zblewski. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 1/30/20. (xc: Copy of this Order mailed to Talashek and Zblewski to the addresses outlined in Docket Entry No. #25 and to pro se party.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) Modified on 2/3/2020 (mg). Modified on 2/3/2020 (mg).
January 22, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss or Answer the First Amended Complaint (Unopposed) by Tunnul Holdings, Inc., Joseph Ullman. (Cothern, Jeremy)
January 16, 2020 Filing 29 DEFENDANT JAMES R. RENFRO'S ORIGINAL ANSWER to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint re #17 Amended Complaint by James Renfro. (mg)
January 14, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew Weber re #26 Order on Motion to Continue, (Peal, Robert)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to continue the initial case management conference (Docket No. #22 ) is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED to 3:00 p.m., Thursday, February 27, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/13/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
January 10, 2020 Filing 28 DEFENDANT JAMES R. RENFRO'S ORIGINAL ANSWER to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint re #17 Amended Complaint by James Renfro.(mg)
January 10, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Thomas Talashek, Michael Zblewski by Andrew Weber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Grace A. Fox)(Fox, Grace)
January 10, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by Andrew Weber re #17 Amended Complaint, Notice of Amended Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Certificate of Service)(Fox, Grace) Modified on 1/13/2020 (mg).
January 10, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS returned executed by Andrew Weber. Energy Resource Fund I, LLC served on 1/9/2020; James Renfro served on 1/9/2020. (Peal, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Continue Unopposed Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Andrew Weber. (Peal, Robert)
January 2, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS returned executed by Andrew Weber. Tunnul Holdings, Inc. served on 12/25/2019; Joseph Ullman served on 12/25/2019. (Peal, Robert)
December 17, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint, by Matthew Harrison.(Warth, Andrew) Modified on 12/18/2019 (mg).
December 10, 2019 Filing 19 RECEIPT #34675057226 in the amount of $100 posted by Matthew Harrison re #15 Natalie Sears to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (mg)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED to 9:30 a.m., Friday, January 24, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/4/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
November 27, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Andrew Weber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Spoonts Email to AW, #2 Exhibit 2 - $1 Million Executive Summary, #3 Exhibit 3 - $1 Million Escrow Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Executed Investor Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Executed Escrow Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Renfro Email re: Executed Amendment, #7 Exhibit 7 - Renfro Email re: 250K Investment, #8 Exhibit 8 - Tunnul 260K Executed Agreement, #9 Exhibit 9 - Weber Email re: Funds Received, #10 Exhibit 10 - Tunnul letter to Talashek, #11 Exhibit 11 - Renfro Email re: Pfanenstiel, #12 Exhibit 12 - 8-7-19 Tunnul Letter, #13 Exhibit 13 - Weber Email re: Revisions, #14 Exhibit 14 - Renfro Email re: New Agreement, #15 Exhibit 15 - Weber Email re: New Agreement, #16 Exhibit 16 - Ulman Email re: Project Update, #17 Exhibit 17 - Ullman Email re: Signed Definitive Agreement, #18 Exhibit 18 - Renfro Email re: Financing Status, #19 Exhibit 19 - Renfro Email re: Wire Instructions, #20 Exhibit 20 - Renfro Email e: Deal Status, #21 Exhibit 21 - Renfro Email to Kloberdanz, #22 Exhibit 22 - Weber Email to Talashek, #23 Exhibit 23 - Renfro Email re: Historical Revenue Information, #24 Exhibit 24 - Tunnul Placement Letter, #25 Exhibit 25 - Renfro Email to Tunnul, #26 Exhibit 26 - Email re: Termination of Transaction, #27 Exhibit 27 - Renfro Email to Talashek, #28 Exhibit 28 - Rowan Email, #29 Exhibit 29 - Renfro Email re: Communication Channels)(Fox, Grace)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Craig A. Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 11/25/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Natalie Sears to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 11/25/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
November 25, 2019 TX State Bar status verified as active for Natalie Sears, and Craig A. Harris. (mg)
November 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney Craig A. Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3035958) by Matthew Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Good Standing Certificate)(Warth, Andrew)
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Natalie Sears to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3035954) by Matthew Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Good Standing Certificate)(Warth, Andrew)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Matthew Harrison answer due 12/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/14/2019. (jw)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, Or Otherwise Respond by Matthew Harrison. (Warth, Andrew)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew A. Warth on behalf of Matthew Harrison (Warth, Andrew)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Andrew Weber. Thomas Talashek served on 10/21/2019. (Peal, Robert)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Andrew Weber. Matthew Harrison served on 10/29/2019. (Peal, Robert)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Andrew Weber. Michael Zblewski served on 10/16/2019. (Peal, Robert)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/11/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Energy Resource Fund I, LLC, Matthew Harrison, James Renfro, Thomas Talashek, Tunnul Holdings, Inc., Joseph Ullman, and Michael Zblewski. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
October 10, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert A. Peal, and Grace A. Fox. (mg)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Energy Resource Fund I, LLC, Matthew Harrison, James Renfro, Thomas Talashek, Tunnul Holdings, Inc., Joseph Ullman, Michael Zblewski (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3010017), filed by Andrew Weber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 5/31/18 Email, #2 Exhibit 2 - Exec Summary, #3 Exhibit 3 - Escrow Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Investor Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Escrow Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - 6/6/18 Email, #7 Exhibit 7 - 6/18/18 Email, #8 Exhibit 8 - Agreement, #9 Exhibit 9 - 6/21/18 Email, #10 Exhibit 10 - 6/22/18 Letter, #11 Exhibit 11 - 6/27/18 Email, #12 Exhibit 12 - 8/17/18 Letter, #13 Exhibit 13 - 8/18/18 Email, #14 Exhibit 14 - 8/19/18 Email, #15 Exhibit 15 - 8/20/18 Email, #16 Exhibit 16 - 8/23/18 Email, #17 Exhibit 17 - 8/31/18 Email, #18 Exhibit 18 - 9/5/18 Email, #19 Exhibit 19 - 9/18/18 Email, #20 Exhibit 20 - 9/21/18 Email, #21 Exhibit 21 - 9/21/18 Email, #22 Exhibit 22 - 9/26/18 Email, #23 Exhibit 23 - 9/29/18 Email, #24 Exhibit 24 - 9/30/18 Letter, #25 Exhibit 25 - 10/1/18 Email, #26 Exhibit 26 - 10/1/18 Email, #27 Exhibit 27 - 10/1/18 Email, #28 Exhibit 28 - 10/2/18 Email, #29 Exhibit 29 - 10/3/18 Email, #30 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weber v. Renfro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Zblewski
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Hill
Represented By: Jeremy Matthew Cothern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Renfro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Resource Fund I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tunnul Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Hill
Represented By: Jeremy Matthew Cothern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Harrison
Represented By: Craig A. Harris
Represented By: Andrew A. Warth
Represented By: Natalie Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Talashek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Ullman
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Hill
Represented By: Jeremy Matthew Cothern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Weber
Represented By: Robert A. Peal
Represented By: Grace A. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?