Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Pena
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Ricardo Pena
Case Number: 3:2019cv00908
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED to 10:30 a.m., Friday, January 31, 2020, in Courtroom No. 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/4/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/22/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (jw)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Ricardo Pena. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw)
October 21, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Neil M. McIntire. (jw)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (jw)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ricardo Pena (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3011979), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Ricardo's Social Media Advertisement, #3 Report on Filing of an Action Regarding Copyright)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Neil M. McIntire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?