Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. Heglie
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Defendant: Keith A. Heglie
Case Number: 3:2019cv00939
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 RECEIPT #34675057214 in the amount of $100 posted by Keith A. Heglie re #8 Michael James Harper's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (mg)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Michael James Harper to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/10/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 9, 2019 AZ State Bar status verified as active for Michael J. Harper. (mg)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Michael James Harper to Appear Pro Hac Vice ($100 Fee Paid) by Keith A. Heglie. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(mg)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Puryear, Daniel)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference RESET for 1/9/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (gb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Keith A. Heglie. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand)(Lawless, Thomas)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (gb)
October 24, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Daniel H. Puryear and Thomas William Lawless. (gb)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Keith A. Heglie from Chancery Court for Davidson County, case number 19-1110-III. (Filing fee paid $400 receipt number 0650-3017486) (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Filings, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. Heglie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith A. Heglie
Represented By: Thomas William Lawless
Represented By: Michael J. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Represented By: Daniel H. Puryear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?