Ayers v. WalMart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Holly Ayers
Defendant: Walmart, Inc and WalMart, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00940
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/29/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Walmart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment attachment to business entity disclosure)(Callaway, Gregory)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (jm)
October 28, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gregory W. Callaway and R. Barry Gearon, Jr. (jm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WalMart, Inc. from Circuit Court of Davidson County, case number 19C2038. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0650-3018235) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - summons, #3 Exhibit - complaint)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayers v. WalMart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WalMart, Inc.
Represented By: R. Barry Gearon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Ayers
Represented By: Gregory W. Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?