Brennan v. Mayes et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Brennan
Defendant: Tony Mayes, The Tennessee Department of Corrections and Tony Parker
Case Number: 3:2019cv00948
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tony Mayes, Tony Parker, The Tennessee Department of Corrections . (Brenner, Jennifer)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Tony Mayes, Tony Parker, The Tennessee Department of Corrections. (Brenner, Jennifer)
December 12, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jennifer L. Brenner. (jw)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Tony Mayes, Tony Parker AND The Tennessee Department of Corrections answer due 12/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/27/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Tony Mayes, Tony Parker, The Tennessee Department of Corrections. (Brenner, Jennifer)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Brenner on behalf of Tony Mayes, Tony Parker, The Tennessee Department of Corrections (Brenner, Jennifer)
November 20, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Disregard DE #4 - entered in error. (jw)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Joseph Brennan. The Tennessee Department of Corrections served on 11/5/2019. (Scruggs, Mark)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Joseph Brennan. Tony Parker served on 11/5/2019. (Scruggs, Mark)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Joseph Brennan. Tony Mayes served on 11/5/2019. (Scruggs, Mark)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/30/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 ***DISREGARD - ENTERED IN ERROR*** NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (jw) Modified on 11/20/2019 (jw).
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Tony Mayes, Tony Parker, The Tennessee Department of Corrections. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
October 29, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mark Christopher Scruggs. (jw)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tony Mayes, Tony Parker, The Tennessee Department of Corrections (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3018747), filed by Joseph Brennan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jw) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/10/2019) (jw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brennan v. Mayes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Mayes
Represented By: Jennifer L. Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Tennessee Department of Corrections
Represented By: Jennifer L. Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Parker
Represented By: Jennifer L. Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Brennan
Represented By: Mark Christopher Scruggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?