Delgado v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Shelby Jean Delgado
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2019cv00951
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Jeremiah D. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/18/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 17, 2019 MO State Bar status verified as active for Jeremiah D. Hayes. (dt)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Jeremiah D. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee waived) by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Hayes, Jeremiah) Modified on 12/17/2019 (dt).
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Social Security Administration, served on 11/12/2019. (jm)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney General, served on 11/14/2019. (jm)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the U.S. Attorney on 11/7/2019. (jm)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Forwarded to USM for service of process.) (jm)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff's request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No. #3 ) is GRANTED. Pursuant to Rule 72 of the FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE and 28 U.S.C. 636 (b)(1), this case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for a scheduling order, for decision on all non dispositive matters, and for a Report and Recommendation on disposition of Plaintiff's Complaint for judicial review of the decision of the Social Security Administration. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/4/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (jm)
November 4, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (jm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Shelby Jean Delgado. (jm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Shelby Jean Delgado. (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delgado v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Jean Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Jeremiah D. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?