Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes, Division, IBT v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes, Division, IBT
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00972
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:152
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher W. Cardwell, Mary Taylor Gallagher. (am)
December 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes, Division, IBT. (Hamilton, William)
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Taylor Gallagher on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Gallagher, Mary)
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Cardwell, Christopher)
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W. Cardwell on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Cardwell, Christopher)
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes, Division, IBT. CSX Transportation, Inc. waiver sent on 11/25/2019. (Hamilton, William)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Aaron Edelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 11/22/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
November 20, 2019 DC State Bar status verified as active for Aaron S. Edelman. (am)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Richard Edelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 11/15/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Aaron Edelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3031234) by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes, Division, IBT. (Attachments: #1 Attachment certificate of good standing)(Hamilton, William)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Richard Edelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3031225) by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes, Division, IBT. (Attachments: #1 Attachment certificate of good standing)(Hamilton, William)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/4/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
November 4, 2019 State Bar status verified as active for (TN) William Michael Hamilton, (DC) Richard S. Edelman. (am)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to CSX Transportation, Inc. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSX Transportation, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3022256), filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes, Division, IBT. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - Public Law Board No.7529)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes, Division, IBT v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes, Division, IBT
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Represented By: William Michael Hamilton
Represented By: Aaron S. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher W. Cardwell
Represented By: Mary Taylor Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?