Clinard v. Karen Wallace Bolton Living Trust et al
Plaintiff: Joe Clinard
Defendant: Karen Wallace Bolton Living Trust, The and Karen Bolton
Case Number: 3:2019cv00975
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/17/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Karen Bolton and Karen Wallace Bolton Living Trust, The by Joe Clinard. (dt)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to oversee service of process on the defendants, to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Plaintiff is further notified that he MUST keep the Court informed at all times of his current address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/12/19. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Karen Bolton and The Karen Wallace Bolton Living Trust. (Service copies returned to pro se plaintiff by mail.)(dt) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/4/2019) (dt).
November 4, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (dt)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Karen Bolton, Karen Wallace Bolton Living Trust (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 34675056806), filed by Joe Clinard. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Business Information Search, #2 Attachment B - Emails with Real Estate Sales Contract, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Attachment - Receipt)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clinard v. Karen Wallace Bolton Living Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Wallace Bolton Living Trust, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Clinard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?