Sheet Metal Workers' Health & Welfare Fund of North Carolina et al v. Stromberg Metal Works, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Sheet Metal Workers' International Scholarship Fund, Sheet Metal Workers' Union Training Fund of North Carolina, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, National Energy Management Institute Committee for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry, Sheet Metal Workers' Health & Welfare Fund of North Carolina and National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry
Defendant: Jazmin Castrejon, Triangle Servitek, LLC, Joel Garcia Castillo and Stromberg Metal Works, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00976
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by Stromberg Metal Works, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Respond to Complaint)(Pierce, Douglas)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Ray Pierce on behalf of Stromberg Metal Works, Inc. (Pierce, Douglas)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed on behalf of Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, et via Tre Hargett, Secretary of State of Tennessee Division of Business Services Department of State against Stromberg Metal Works, Inc. et al served on 12/6/2019. (mg)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED to 1:30 p.m., Tuesday, February 11, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/4/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons issued as to Stromberg Metal Works, Inc. (Service copies picked up at intake.) (jm)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 72 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), this case is referred to the Magistrate Judge for entry of a scheduling order; for decision on all pretrial, non-dispositive motions; and for reports and recommendations on all dispositive motions. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/4/2019. (mg)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Joel Garcia Castillo, Jazmin Castrejon, Triangle Servitek, LLC. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (mg)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
November 4, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for R. Jan Jennings, and Karla M. Campbell. (mg)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joel Garcia Castillo, Jazmin Castrejon, Stromberg Metal Works, Inc., Triangle Servitek, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3023572), filed by Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, Sheet Metal Workers' International Scholarship Fund, Sheet Metal Workers' Health & Welfare Fund of North Carolina, Sheet Metal Workers' Union Training Fund of North Carolina, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheet Metal Workers' Health & Welfare Fund of North Carolina et al v. Stromberg Metal Works, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazmin Castrejon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triangle Servitek, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Garcia Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stromberg Metal Works, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Ray Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust
Represented By: Karla M. Campbell
Represented By: R. Jan Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers' International Scholarship Fund
Represented By: Karla M. Campbell
Represented By: R. Jan Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers' Union Training Fund of North Carolina
Represented By: Karla M. Campbell
Represented By: R. Jan Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
Represented By: Karla M. Campbell
Represented By: R. Jan Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Energy Management Institute Committee for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry
Represented By: Karla M. Campbell
Represented By: R. Jan Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry
Represented By: Karla M. Campbell
Represented By: R. Jan Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers' Health & Welfare Fund of North Carolina
Represented By: Karla M. Campbell
Represented By: R. Jan Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry
Represented By: Karla M. Campbell
Represented By: R. Jan Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?