Roelle v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Michael Dennis Roelle
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2019cv00993
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Jeremiah D. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/20/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 19, 2019 MO State Bar status verified as active for Jeremiah D. Hayes. (am)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Jeremiah D. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Hayes, Jeremiah)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel on 11/12/2019 by Michael Dennis Roelle. (Osterhout, Karl) Modified Text on 11/27/2019 (am).
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attorney General on 11/15/2019 by Michael Dennis Roelle. (Osterhout, Karl)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney on 11/13/2019 by Michael Dennis Roelle. (Osterhout, Karl)
November 20, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert Scott Wilson. (am)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 72 of the FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), this case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for a scheduling order, for decision on all nondispositive matters, and for a Report and Recommendation on disposition of Plaintiff's Complaint for judicial review of the decision of the Social Security Administration. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/19/2019. (am)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Scott Wilson on behalf of Michael Dennis Roelle (Wilson, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No. #3 ) is GRANTED. Pursuant to Rule 72 of the FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE and 28 U.S.C. 636 (b)(1), this case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for a scheduling order, for decision on all non dispositive matters, and for a Report and Recommendation on disposition of Plaintiff's Complaint for judicial review of the decision of the Social Security Administration. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/13/2019. (jm)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Karl Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 11/12/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Karl Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3028286) by Michael Dennis Roelle. (Attachments: #1 Attachment CGS WD PA, #2 Attachment CGS Supreme Court, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Osterhout, Karl)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
November 7, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Karl E. Osterhout: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 11/29/2019. (am)
November 7, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Karl E. Osterhout: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/29/2019. (am)
November 7, 2019 PA State Bar status verified as active for Karl E. Osterhout. (am)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3027071), filed by Michael Dennis Roelle. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roelle v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dennis Roelle
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Represented By: Robert Scott Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Jeremiah D. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?