5th of July, LLC et al v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: 5th of July, LLC and Sweety High, Inc.
Defendant: Daniel Alan Thomas, T M T and Kristina Marie Thomas
Case Number: 3:2019cv00994
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Continue ICMC. ICMC reset to 3/17/20 at1:30 pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 01/03/2020. (mg)
January 3, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Continue Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference by 5th of July, LLC, Sweety High, Inc.. (Thomas, James)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 2/25/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/4/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing by 5th of July, LLC, Sweety High, Inc. (Waivers of the Service of a Summons) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Waiver of Service of Summons to Daniel Thomas, #2 Attachment Waiver of Service of Summons to Kristina Thomas, #3 Attachment Waiver of Service of Summons to TMT (redacted))(Aaron, Benjamin)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against T M T, Daniel Alan Thomas and Kristina Marie Thomas, filed by 5th of July, LLC and Sweety High, Inc.(dt)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing by 5th of July, LLC, Sweety High, Inc. Notice of Filing (Amended Complaint) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Complaint)(Harwell, Aubrey)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SEALED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #2 Motion to Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/13/2019. (xc: All counsel by e-mail) (hb) Modified text on 11/13/2019 (hb).
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/8/2019. (xc: Counsel of record by email.)(dt)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sweety High, Inc.. (dt)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 5th of July, LLC. (dt)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Daniel Alan Thomas, Kristina Marie Thomas and TMT. (Service copies picked up by counsel.) (dt) Modified text on 11/13/2019 (hb).
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by 5th of July, LLC and Sweety High, Inc. (dt)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel Alan Thomas, Kristina Marie Thomas and TMT (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 34675056876), filed by 5th of July, LLC, Sweety High, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Receipt, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) Modified text on 11/13/2019 (hb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 5th of July, LLC et al v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Alan Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T M T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina Marie Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 5th of July, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C. Aaron
Represented By: Aubrey B. Harwell, Jr.
Represented By: James G. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sweety High, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C. Aaron
Represented By: Aubrey B. Harwell, Jr.
Represented By: James G. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?