Muckle et al v. Alumacraft Boat Co. et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Muckle and Kevin Muckle
Defendant: Alumacraft Boat Co. and Robert Woodall
Case Number: 3:2019cv01000
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The court has been notified that this case has settled. It is hereby ORDERED that a stipulation of dismissal or other settlement document shall be filed by January 16, 2020. The Initial Case Management Conference set for January 17, 2020 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/2/2019. (jm)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/18/2019. (jm)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Strike Portions of Complaint by Alumacraft Boat Co.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment ALR Article)(Mantooth, David)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Alumacraft Boat Co. (jm)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 01:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jm)
November 13, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Roger Wilson Hudson, David Randall Mantooth, Danny R. Ellis, and Jamie J. Morrell. (jm)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alumacraft Boat Co. from Sumner County, Tennessee Circuit Court, case number 83CC1-2019-CV-761. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3028672) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment State Court File)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muckle et al v. Alumacraft Boat Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alumacraft Boat Co.
Represented By: Roger Wilson Hudson
Represented By: David Randall Mantooth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Woodall
Represented By: Roger Wilson Hudson
Represented By: David Randall Mantooth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Muckle
Represented By: Danny R. Ellis
Represented By: Jamie J. Morrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Muckle
Represented By: Danny R. Ellis
Represented By: Jamie J. Morrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?