Perry v. Tennessee, State of et al
Petitioner: Courtney Perry
Respondent: House Committee of Congress, Charles Kalpatrick, Tennessee, State of, Marshall Blackburn and Kathleen Hank Sawyer
Case Number: 3:2019cv01011
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This matter is therefore DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the Court's Order. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/7/20. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Petitioner is DIRECTED to submit either the $5.00 habeas corpus filing fee or a second, properly supported IFP application within 28 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/27/2019. (xc:Pro se party sent this order, blank short-form IFP application, and a blank Section 2254 Petition by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) Modified on 12/2/2019 (jm). Modified on 12/2/2019 (jm).
November 20, 2019 (Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (afs)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (afs)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Courtney Perry. (afs)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Courtney Perry.(afs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Tennessee, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: House Committee of Congress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles Kalpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tennessee, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marshall Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kathleen Hank Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Courtney Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?