Bunt v. Clarksville Montgomery County School System
Plaintiff: Kathleen A. Bunt
Defendant: Clarksville Montgomery County School System
Case Number: 3:2019cv01013
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. On December 18, 2019, Defendant filed a motion for an extension of time (Docket No. 8) to respond to Plaintiff's motion to remand (Docket No. 7). Defendant's motion (Docket No. 8) is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's motion to remand on or before January 24, 2020. Defendant's response shall not exceed 20 pages. Plaintiff may file an optional reply of no more than 10 pages by no later than February 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/23/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (am)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Enlargement by Clarksville Montgomery County School System. (Porter, Kaya)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand this Case to the Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Tennessee at Clarksville and Request for a Jury Demand by Kathleen A. Bunt. (am)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: By Order entered November 25, 2019 (Docket Entry No. 4), the Court referred this pro se action to the Magistrate Judge for pretrial proceedings under 28 U.S.C. 636 (b)(1), Rule 72 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Local Rules of Court. Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties in this action are exempt from the initial disclosures required by Rule 26(a) and the requirements of Rule 26(f). Pursuant to Local Rule 16.01(c)(1), this case is exempt from customized case management. By separate order, the Court will enter a scheduling order setting out deadlines for the progression of this case. The Clerk is directed to send all orders entered in this case to the pro se Plaintiff by regular, first class mail (only), unless otherwise directed by the Court. So ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/3/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (am)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF TRANSFER RECORD by Kathleen A. Bunt (am)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/25/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
November 19, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (jm)
November 19, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Charles W. Cagle. (jm)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Clarksville Montgomery County School System from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Tennessee, case number 25301-IV. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3032289) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Complaint) (jm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2019: #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet) (jm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunt v. Clarksville Montgomery County School System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarksville Montgomery County School System
Represented By: Charles W. Cagle
Represented By: Kaya G. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen A. Bunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?