Vest v. The Nissan Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan II et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca Vest
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc. and The Nissan Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan II
Case Number: 3:2019cv01021
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.01(h)(2), the District Judge is provided notice that on November 27, 2019, Defendants filed a motion to dismiss or alternatively compel arbitration and stay proceedings (Docket Nos. 8, 9). Plaintiff responded in opposition on December 11, 2019, Docket Entry No. 10, and Defendants filed a reply on December 18, 2019, Docket Entry No. 11. The Clerk of Court shall forward this motion and the responsive filings for the District Judge's consideration. The initial case management conference remains scheduled on January 21, 2010, absent further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/23/2019. (am)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or alternatively Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Nissan North America, Inc., The Nissan Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan II. (Boston, Robert)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or alternatively Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Rebecca Vest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7/24/19 Email from B. Boston to S. Solomon, #2 Exhibit 8/25/19 Email from B. Boston to S. Solomon, #3 Exhibit 9/20/19 Email from B. Boston to S. Solomon, #4 Exhibit Vest Consent to Arbitration, #5 Exhibit 10/23/19 Email from B. Boston, #6 Exhibit 10/23/19 R. Loofbourrow Response to B. Boston, #7 Exhibit 10/23/19 B. Boston Response to R. Loofbourrow, #8 Exhibit 10/25/19 Email from AAA Arbitration, #9 Exhibit 10/28/19 Email from R. Loofbourrow to B. Boston, #10 Exhibit 11/12/18 Email from B. Boston to R. Loofbourrow, #11 Exhibit 11/18/19 Withdrawal of Arbitration Demand, #12 Exhibit 11/19/19 B. Boston Response to Withdrawal of Arbitration Demand, #13 Exhibit 11/19/19 AAA Response to B. Boston)(Loofbourrow, Ryan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss or alternatively Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Nissan North America, Inc., The Nissan Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan II . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Arbitration Demand)(Boston, Robert)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss or alternatively Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Nissan North America, Inc., The Nissan Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan II. (Boston, Robert)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Rebecca Vest. Nissan North America, Inc. served on 11/25/2019. (Loofbourrow, Ryan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Rebecca Vest. The Nissan Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan II served on 11/25/2019. (Loofbourrow, Ryan)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (jm)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Nissan North America, Inc. and The Nissan Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan II. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (jm)
November 19, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kevin C. Klein and Ryan P. Loofbourrow. (jm)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nissan North America, Inc. and The Nissan Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan II (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3033144), filed by Rebecca Vest. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - The Plan, #3 Exhibit 2 - Nissan's Advisory Position, #4 Exhibit 3 - Vest's Request for Review, #5 Exhibit 4 - Vest's Affidavit in Support of her Request for Review)(jm) Modified on 11/19/2019 (jm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vest v. The Nissan Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan II et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Earl Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nissan Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan II
Represented By: Robert Earl Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Vest
Represented By: Ryan P. Loofbourrow
Represented By: Kevin C. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?