Ingram Barge Company, LLC v. Bunge North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ingram Barge Company, LLC
Defendant: Bunge North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01030
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Grace A. Fox. MO State Bar status verified as active for Bridget G. Hoy and R. Bradley Ziegler. (vh)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Given the filing of a Motion to Dismiss and/or to Transfer Venue (Docket No. 14), the initial case management conference scheduled for January 17, 2020 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, following disposition of this motion. It is so ORDERED. ENTER this 14th day of January 2020. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/14/2020. (vh)
January 13, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of #14 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue filed by Bunge North America, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Matthew Coulter Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1A - Melerine 4/18/19 Email, #3 Exhibit 1B - Cooper 3/20/19 Letter)(Fox, Grace)
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Change Venue by Bunge North America, Inc.. (Fox, Grace)
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bunge North America, Inc.. (Fox, Grace)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Bridget G. Hoy and R. Bradley Ziegler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3064828) by Bunge North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Bridget G. Hoy, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing for Bridget G. Hoy, #3 Attachment Declaration of R. Bradley Ziegler, #4 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing for R. Bradley Ziegler)(Fox, Grace)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Grace A. Fox on behalf of Bunge North America, Inc. (Fox, Grace)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled in this case for January 17, 2020 at 1:45 p.m. is hereby RESET for the same day at 2:00 p.m. It is so ORDERED. ENTER this 17th day of December 2019. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/17/19. (af)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for David L. Reisman, Raymond T. Waid, and Trinity Morale to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/11/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney David L. Reisman, Raymond T. Waid, Trinity A. Morale to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3047513) by Ingram Barge Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Declaration of David L. Reisman, #2 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing (D. Reisman), #3 Attachment - Declaration of Raymond T. Waid, #4 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing (R. Waid), #5 Attachment - Declaration of Trinity A. Morale, #6 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing (T. Morale), #7 Attachment - Proposed Order)(Phillips, W.)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Ingram Barge Company, LLC. Bunge North America, Inc. served on 11/21/2019. (Phillips, W.)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 01:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jm)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Bunge North America, Inc. (Service copies to be picked up by counsel.) (jm)
November 20, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL David L. Reisman, Raymond T. Waid, Trinity Morale: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/11/2019. (jm)
November 20, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for W. Brantley Phillips, Jr.; LA State Bar status verified as active for David L. Reisman, Raymond T. Waid, and Trinity Morale. (jm)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ingram Barge Company, LLC. (jm)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bunge North America, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3033830), filed by Ingram Barge Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Grain Transportation Terms, #3 Exhibit B - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00722, #4 Exhibit C - Invoice No. 147997 dated July 10, 2019, #5 Exhibit D - Rebill Invoice No. 1960113 dated July 15, 2019, #6 Exhibit E - Accounting record for payment made August 13, 2019, #7 Exhibit F - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00721, #8 Exhibit G - Invoice No. 147997 dated July 10, 2019, #9 Exhibit H - Rebill Invoice No. 1960113 dated July 15, 2019, #10 Exhibit I - Accounting record for payment made August 13, 2019, #11 Exhibit J - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00621, #12 Exhibit K - Invoice No. 147997 dated July 10, 2019, #13 Exhibit L - Rebill Invoice No. 1960113 dated July 15, 2019, #14 Exhibit M - Accounting record for payment made August 13, 2019, #15 Exhibit N - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00715, #16 Exhibit O - Invoice No. 148074 dated July 29, 2019, #17 Exhibit P - Rebill Invoice No. 1963444 dated August 9, 2019, #18 Exhibit Q - Accounting record for payment made September 3, 2019, #19 Exhibit R - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00677, #20 Exhibit S - Invoice No. 147985 dated June 30, 2019, #21 Exhibit T - Rebill Invoice No. 1960115 dated July 15, 2019, #22 Exhibit U - Accounting record for payment made August 6, 2019, #23 Exhibit V - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00631, #24 Exhibit W - Invoice No. 147985 dated June 30, 2019, #25 Exhibit X - Rebill Invoice No. 1960115 dated July 15, 2019, #26 Exhibit Y - Accounting record for payment made August 6, 2019, #27 Exhibit Z - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00711, #28 Exhibit AA - Invoice No. 148075 dated July 29, 2019, #29 Exhibit BB - Rebill Invoice No. 1963445 dated August 9, 2019, #30 Exhibit CC - Accounting record for payment made September 3, 2019, #31 Exhibit DD - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00679, #32 Exhibit EE - Invoice No. 147985 dated June 30, 3019, #33 Exhibit FF - Rebill Invoice No. 1960115 dated July 15, 2019, #34 Exhibit GG - Accounting record for payment made August 6, 2019, #35 Exhibit HH - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00632, #36 Exhibit II - Invoice No. 147985 dated June 30, 2019, #37 Exhibit JJ - Rebill Invoice No. 1960115 dated July 15, 2019, #38 Exhibit KK - Accounting record for payment made August 6, 2019, #39 Exhibit LL - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00720, #40 Exhibit MM - Invoice No. 147998 dated July 10, 2019, #41 Exhibit NN - Rebill Invoice No. 1960112 dated July 15, 2019, #42 Exhibit OO - Accounting record for payment made August 13, 2019, #43 Exhibit PP - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00944, #44 Exhibit QQ - Invoice No. 148107 dated July 31, 2019, #45 Exhibit RR - Rebill Invoice No. 1963450 dated August 9, 2019, #46 Exhibit SS - Accounting record for payment made September 3, 2019, #47 Exhibit TT - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00666, #48 Exhibit UU - Invoice No. 147986 dated June 30, 2019, #49 Exhibit VV - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00879, #50 Exhibit WW - Accounting record for payment made August 6, 2019, #51 Exhibit XX - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00633, #52 Exhibit YY - Invoice No. 147986 dated June 30, 2019, #53 Exhibit ZZ - Rebill Invoice No. 1960114 dated July 15, 2019, #54 Exhibit AAA - Accounting record for payment made August 6, 2019, #55 Exhibit BBB - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00566, #56 Exhibit CCC - Invoice No. 147986 dated June 30, 2019, #57 Exhibit DDD - Rebill Invoice No. 1960114 dated July 15, 2019, #58 Exhibit EEE - Accounting record for payment made August 6, 2019, #59 Exhibit FFF - Bill of Lading ING19-00464, #60 Exhibit GGG - Invoice No. 147910 dated June 5, 2019, #61 Exhibit HHH - Rebill Invoice No. 1956766 dated June 14, 2019, #62 Exhibit III - Accounting record for payment made July 9, 2019, #63 Exhibit JJJ - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00880, #64 Exhibit KKK - Invoice No. 148073 dated July 29, 2019, #65 Exhibit LLL - Rebill Invoice No. 1963443 dated August 9, 2019, #66 Exhibit MMM - Accounting record for payment made September 3, 2019, #67 Exhibit NNN - Bill of Lading No. ING19-01004, #68 Exhibit OOO - Invoice No. 148106 dated July 31, 2019, #69 Exhibit PPP - Rebill Invoice No. 1963449 dated August 9, 2019, #70 Exhibit QQQ - Accounting record for payment made September 3, 2019, #71 Exhibit RRR - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00753, #72 Exhibit SSS - Invoice No. 148073 dated July 29, 2019, #73 Exhibit TTT - Rebill Invoice No. 1963443 dated August 9, 2019, #74 Exhibit UUU - Accounting record for payment made September 3, 2019, #75 Exhibit VVV - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00879, #76 Exhibit WWW - Invoice No. 148074 dated July 29, 2019, #77 Exhibit XXX - Rebill Invoice No. 1963444 dated August 9, 2019, #78 Exhibit YYY - Accounting record for payment made September 3, 2019, #79 Exhibit ZZZ - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00806, #80 Exhibit AAAA - Invoice No. 148130 dated August 6, 2019, #81 Exhibit BBBB - Rebill Invoice No. 1963452 dated August 9, 2019, #82 Exhibit CCCC - Accounting record for payment made November 12, 2019, #83 Exhibit DDDD - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00829, #84 Exhibit EEEE - Invoice No. 148075 dated July 29, 2019, #85 Exhibit FFFF - Rebill Invoice No. 1963445 dated August 9, 2019, #86 Exhibit GGGG - Accounting record for payment made September 3, 2019, #87 Exhibit HHHH - Bill of Lading No ING19-00832, #88 Exhibit IIII - Invoice No. 148109 date August 6, 2019, #89 Exhibit JJJJ - Invoice No. 1963451 dated August 9, 2019, #90 Exhibit KKKK - Accounting record for payment made November 12, 2019, #91 Exhibit LLLL - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00756, #92 Exhibit MMMM - Invoice No. 148079 dated July 29, 2019, #93 Exhibit NNNN - Rebill Invoice No. 1963448 dated August 9, 2019, #94 Exhibit OOOO - Accounting record for payment made September 3, 2019, #95 Exhibit PPPP - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00899, #96 Exhibit QQQQ - Invoice No. 148079 dated July 29, 2019, #97 Exhibit RRRR - Rebill Invoice No. 1963448 dated August 9, 2019, #98 Exhibit SSSS - Accounting record for payment made September 3, 2019, #99 Exhibit TTTT - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00971, #100 Exhibit UUUU - Invoice No. 83334 dated September 3, 2019, #101 Exhibit VVVV - Rebill Invoice No. 1971960 dated October 11, 2019, #102 Exhibit WWWW - Accounting record for payment made October 22, 2019, #103 Exhibit XXXX - Bill of Lading No. ING19-00830, #104 Exhibit YYYY - Invoice No. 83334 dated September 3, 2019, #105 Exhibit ZZZZ - Rebill Invoice No. 1971960 dated October 11, 2019, #106 Exhibit AAAAA - Accounting record for payment made August 6, 2019, #107 Exhibit BBBBB - Demurrage Invoice No. 1959315 dated July 8, 2019)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingram Barge Company, LLC v. Bunge North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bunge North America, Inc.
Represented By: Bridget G. Hoy
Represented By: R. Bradley Ziegler
Represented By: Grace A. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingram Barge Company, LLC
Represented By: W. Brantley Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: David L. Reisman
Represented By: Raymond T. Waid
Represented By: Trinity Morale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?