Southall v. USF Holland, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ernest A. Southall
Defendant: Teamsters Local 480, USF Holland, LLC and Occupational Centers of the Southwest, P.A. Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01033
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: On January 15, 2020, Defendant Teamsters Local Union 480 filed a motion to dismiss. (Doc. No. 30.) Pursuant to Local Rule 7.01(a)(3), any response is to be filed within 14 days after service of the motion. M.D. Tenn. R. 7.01(a) (3) (response). A reply memorandum not to exceed five pages may be filed within 7 days after service of the response. Id. 7.01(a)(4) (reply). Any filings made related to the motion to dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Judge Richardson unless referred to the undersigned magistrate judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/16/2020. (am)
January 15, 2020 Filing 31 Memorandum in Support of MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Teamsters Local 480. (Taylor, Timothy) Modified Text on 1/16/2020 (am).
January 15, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Teamsters Local 480. (Taylor, Timothy)
January 15, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 2/12/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Joint Stipulation and Request to Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference. The motion is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is RESET for February 12, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/15/2020. (am)
January 15, 2020 Filing 28 Joint Stipulation and Request to Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference by USF Holland, LLC. (Doran, John) Modified Text on 1/15/2020 (am).
January 7, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Timothy Paul Taylor. (am)
January 3, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Paul Taylor on behalf of Teamsters Local 480 (Taylor, Timothy)
January 1, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS returned executed by Ernest A. Southall. USF Holland, LLC served on 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Domestic Return Receipt)(Crawley, Gina)
January 1, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS returned executed by Ernest A. Southall. Occupational Centers of the Southwest, P.A. Co. served on 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Domestic Return Receipt)(Crawley, Gina)
January 1, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS returned executed by Ernest A. Southall. Teamsters Local 480 served on 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Domestic Return Receipt)(Crawley, Gina)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Motion for John Alan Doran to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/26/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Lori Wright-Keffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/26/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 24, 2019 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENT filed by USF Holland, LLC re #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Annotation - Deficiency Notice,,,. (Doran, John)
December 24, 2019 Filing 20 SUPPLEMENT filed by USF Holland, LLC re #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Annotation - Deficiency Notice,,,. (Wright-Keffer, Lori)
December 23, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# [18,19]: The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney, and if so, providing complete details about the proceeding or charges, including outcome. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (am)
December 23, 2019 AZ State Bar status verified as active for Lori Wright-Keffer, John Alan Doran. (am)
December 20, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney John Alan Doran to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3054529) by USF Holland, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificates of Good Standing)(Doran, John)
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Lori Wright Keffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3054411) by USF Holland, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificates of Good Standing)(Wright-Keffer, Lori)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer USF Holland, LLC answer due 1/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/19/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
December 19, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Steven E. Anderson. (am)
December 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by USF Holland, LLC. (Anderson, Steven)
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E. Anderson on behalf of USF Holland, LLC (Anderson, Steven)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Occupational Centers of the Southwest, P.A. Co. answer due 1/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/16/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Occupational Centers of the Southwest, P.A. Co.. (Evans, Austin)
December 6, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert M. Burns, Austin C. Evans. (am)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin C. Evans on behalf of Occupational Centers of the Southwest, P.A. Co. (Evans, Austin)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Burns on behalf of Occupational Centers of the Southwest, P.A. Co. (Burns, Robert)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Teamsters Local 480 answer due 1/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/3/2019. (am)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Teamsters Local 480. (Morris, Samuel) Modified Text on 12/3/2019 (am).
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/20/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
November 19, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gina Renee Crawley. (am)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Occupational Centers of the Southwest, P.A. Co., Teamsters Local 480, USF Holland, LLC. (Service packets issued at front counter to Attorney). (am)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ernest A. Southall. (am)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Renee Crawley on behalf of Ernest A. Southall (am)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Occupational Centers of the Southwest, P.A. Co., Teamsters Local 480, USF Holland, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 34675056993), filed by Ernest A. Southall. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment - Receipt, #3 Exhibit A - Rights to Sue, #4 Exhibit B - Rights to Sue, #5 Exhibit C - Rights to Sue, #6 Exhibit D - Rights to Sue)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southall v. USF Holland, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local 480
Represented By: Timothy Paul Taylor
Represented By: Samuel Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USF Holland, LLC
Represented By: Steven E. Anderson
Represented By: Lori Wright-Keffer
Represented By: John Alan Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occupational Centers of the Southwest, P.A. Co.
Represented By: Austin C. Evans
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest A. Southall
Represented By: Gina Renee Crawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?