Ginsberg v. SmileDirectClub, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Barry Ginsberg
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Jefferies LLC, Kyle Wailes, David Katzman, SmileDirectClub, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Steven Katzman, Alexander Fenkell, UBS Securities, LLC, Camelot Venture Group and Bofa Securities, Inc.
Petitioner: Thomas Derus, Wei Wei, Joe Stofko, 1199 SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund and Camelot Event Driven Fund
Intervenor Plaintiff: MICHAEL J MORSE
Case Number: 3:2019cv01040
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: The Case Management Conference set for January 22, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. The Conference will be reset after ruling on the pending Motions regarding Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, Appointment of Lead Counsel, and Consolidation of Cases. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 1/17/2020. (vh)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #73 Motion for Jay B. Kasner, Scott D. Musoff, and Michael C. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 1/7/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #80 Motion for Robert V. Prongay to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/26/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #79 Motion for Casey Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/26/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 20, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION for attorney Robert Prongay to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3054818) by Camelot Event Driven Fund, Joe Stofko. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Robert Prongay Declaration, #2 Attachment Prongay Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Swafford, Tara)
December 20, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION for attorney Casey Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3054757) by Camelot Event Driven Fund, Joe Stofko. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Casey Sadler Declaration, #2 Attachment Sadler Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Swafford, Tara)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Ira M. Press to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/19/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 18, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Filing by Camelot Event Driven Fund re Annotation - Deficiency Notice,,, #69 MOTION for attorney Ira M. Press to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3050984) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Ira M. Press, #2 Exhibit A to Press Declaration - Certificate of Good Standing)(Swafford, Tara)
December 17, 2019 Filing 76 DECLARATION of Michael C. Griffin filed by Alexander Fenkell, David Katzman, Steven Katzman, SmileDirectClub, Inc., Kyle Wailes re: #73 MOTION for attorney Jay B. Kasner, Scott D. Musoff, and Michael C. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
December 17, 2019 Filing 75 DECLARATION of Scott D. Musoff filed by Alexander Fenkell, David Katzman, Steven Katzman, SmileDirectClub, Inc., Kyle Wailes re: #73 MOTION for attorney Jay B. Kasner, Scott D. Musoff, and Michael C. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
December 17, 2019 Filing 74 DECLARATION of Jay B. Kasner filed by Alexander Fenkell, David Katzman, Steven Katzman, SmileDirectClub, Inc., Kyle Wailes re: #73 MOTION for attorney Jay B. Kasner, Scott D. Musoff, and Michael C. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
December 17, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION for attorney Jay B. Kasner, Scott D. Musoff, and Michael C. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3052169) by Alexander Fenkell, David Katzman, Steven Katzman, SmileDirectClub, Inc., Kyle Wailes. (Riley, Steven) Modified text on 1/6/2020 (gb).
December 17, 2019 Filing 72 RESPONSE filed by 1199 SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund re Annotation - PHV, . (Wood, Christopher)
December 17, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#69 : The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney, and if so, providing complete details about the proceeding or charges, including outcome. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (dt)
December 17, 2019 NY State Bar status verified as active for Ira M. Press. (dt)
December 16, 2019 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Appoint Counsel For Lead Plaintiff and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #52 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to appoint lead Plaintiff and consolidate cases, #54 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by 1199 SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund. (Wood, Christopher)
December 16, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE by Bofa Securities, Inc., Camelot Venture Group, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Alexander Fenkell, J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Jefferies LLC, David Katzman, Steven Katzman, SmileDirectClub, Inc., UBS Securities, LLC, Kyle Wailes of Related Cases (Riley, Steven)
December 16, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION for attorney Ira M. Press to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3050984) by Camelot Event Driven Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing (Press))(Swafford, Tara)
December 13, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE by MICHAEL J MORSE re #52 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to appoint lead Plaintiff and consolidate cases Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Bramlett, Paul)
December 13, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE by Camelot Event Driven Fund, Joe Stofko of Non-Opposition to Appointment of Lead Plaintiff (Swafford, Tara)
December 9, 2019 Filing 66 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by UBS Securities, LLC. (Riley, Steven)
December 9, 2019 Filing 65 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc.. (Riley, Steven)
December 9, 2019 Filing 64 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jefferies LLC. (Riley, Steven)
December 9, 2019 Filing 63 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Riley, Steven)
December 9, 2019 Filing 62 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Riley, Steven)
December 9, 2019 Filing 61 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bofa Securities, Inc.. (Riley, Steven)
December 5, 2019 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Thomas Derus, Wei Wei re #50 MOTION to Appoint Counsel For Lead Plaintiff and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Thomas Derus, Wei Wei, #51 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases Memorandum in Support filed by Thomas Derus, Wei Wei. (Holifield, James)
December 3, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE by MICHAEL J MORSE re #52 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to appoint lead Plaintiff and consolidate cases Notice of filing corrected Certificate of Service (Bramlett, Paul)
December 3, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# [50, 51, 52, and 53]: Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (jm)
December 3, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Darren J. Robbins, Danielle S. Myers, Michael Albert, Robert V. Prongay, Casey E. Sadler, Lesley F. Portnoy, Lewis S. Kahn, Melinda A. Nicholson, and Michael J. Palestina: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/24/2019. (jm)
December 3, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher M. Wood, Paul Kent Bramlett, Robert P. Bramlett, and Tara L. Swafford; CA State Bar status verified as active for Darren J. Robbins, Danielle S. Myers, Michael Albert, Robert V. Prongay, Casey E. Sadler, and Lesley F. Portnoy; LA State Bar status verified as active for Lewis S. Kahn, Melinda A. Nicholson, and Michael J. Palestina. (jm)
December 3, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for James A. Holifield, Jr.; NY State Bar status verified as active for Jeremy A. Lieberman, J. Alexander Hood, II, Phillip Kim, and Laurence M. Rosen. (jm)
December 3, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jeremy A. Lieberman, J. Alexander Hood, II, Phillip Kim, Laurence M. Rosen: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/24/2019. (jm)
December 2, 2019 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Christopher M. Wood in Support filed by 1199 SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund re: #56 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 10/2/19 Notice, #2 Exhibit B - 10/24/19 Notice, #3 Exhibit C - Certification, #4 Exhibit D - Estimate of losses)(Wood, Christopher)
December 2, 2019 Filing 57 BRIEF filed by 1199 SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund re #56 Motion to Consolidate Cases, Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Wood, Christopher)
December 2, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by 1199 SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Christopher)
December 2, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Wood on behalf of 1199 SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund (Wood, Christopher)
December 2, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Joe Stofko, Camelot Event Driven Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Appoint and Consolidate, #2 Attachment Declaration of Tara Swafford, #3 Exhibit A to Decl. - Notice of Pendency, #4 Exhibit B to Decl. - Signed PSLRA Cert., #5 Exhibit C to Decl. - Table of Losses, #6 Exhibit D to Decl. - Firm Resume, #7 Attachment Proposed Order)(Swafford, Tara)
December 2, 2019 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Support of #52 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to appoint lead Plaintiff and consolidate cases filed by MICHAEL J MORSE . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Paul Kent Bramlett, #2 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Certification, #3 Exhibit B-Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit C-Business Wire Notice, #5 Exhibit D-Kahn firm resume, #6 Exhibit E-Bramlett firm resume, #7 Attachment Certificate of Service, #8 Attachment Proposed Order)(Bramlett, Paul)
December 2, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to appoint lead Plaintiff and consolidate cases by MICHAEL J MORSE. (Bramlett, Paul)
December 2, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases Memorandum in Support by Thomas Derus, Wei Wei. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Jeremy A. Lieberman, #2 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #3 Exhibit B - Certification and Schedule A, #4 Exhibit C - Damage Analysis, #5 Exhibit D - Pomerantz Resume, #6 Exhibit E - Rosen Resume, #7 Exhibit F - Holifield Resume)(Holifield, James)
December 2, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Appoint Counsel For Lead Plaintiff and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Thomas Derus, Wei Wei. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Holifield, James)
November 26, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (jm)
November 26, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jay B. Kasner, Scott D. Musoff, Michael Charles Griffin, Ira M. Press: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/17/2019. (jm)
November 26, 2019 NY State Bar status verified as active for Jay B. Kasner, Scott D. Musoff, Michael Charles Griffin, and Ira M. Press. (jm)
November 26, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
November 26, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
November 26, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Steven Allen Riley and Elizabeth O. Gonser. (jm)
November 22, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth O. Gonser on behalf of All Defendants (Gonser, Elizabeth)
November 22, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Allen Riley on behalf of All Defendants (Riley, Steven)
November 21, 2019 Filing 44 Case transferred in from the District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-09794. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 18, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Middle District of Tennessee. (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF TENNESSEE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(A): NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and among the undersigned counsel for the respective Parties, subject to the Court's approval, that: 1. This Action be transferred to the Middle District of Tennessee pursuant to 28 u.s.c. 1404. 2. Upon transfer, the Parties will promptly seek and stipulate to consolidation of this Action with the Franchi action under Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. 3. Defendants' time to answer, move to dismiss or otherwise respond to the existing Complaint in this Action is stayed pending appointment of a lead plaintiff and lead counsel in the consolidated action, pursuant to the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, and the filing of a consolidated amended complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/18/2019) (jca) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 42 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Camelot Venture Group, Alexander Fenkell, David Katzman, Steven Katzman, SmileDirectClub, Inc., Kyle Wailes. (Musoff, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 41 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Camelot Venture Group.(Musoff, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 40 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by SmileDirectClub, Inc..(Musoff, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Charles Griffin on behalf of Camelot Venture Group, Alexander Fenkell, David Katzman, Steven Katzman, SmileDirectClub, Inc., Kyle Wailes. (Griffin, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott D. Musoff on behalf of Camelot Venture Group, Alexander Fenkell, David Katzman, Steven Katzman, SmileDirectClub, Inc., Kyle Wailes. (Musoff, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay B. Kasner on behalf of Camelot Venture Group, Alexander Fenkell, David Katzman, Steven Katzman, SmileDirectClub, Inc., Kyle Wailes. (Kasner, Jay) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order [ECF No. 29] served on SmileDirectClub, Inc., Camelot Venture Group, Alexander Fenkell, David Katzman, Kyle Wailes, and Steven Katzman on 10/31/2019. Service was accepted by Michael C. Griffin, Counsel. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 35 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Steven Katzman served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Service was accepted by Michael C. Griffin, Counsel. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. SmileDirectClub, Inc. served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Service was accepted by Michael C. Griffin, Counsel. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Kyle Wailes served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Service was accepted by Michael C. Griffin, Counsel. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. David Katzman served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Service was accepted by Michael C. Griffin, Counsel. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Camelot Venture Group served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Service was accepted by Michael C. Griffin, Counsel. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Alexander Fenkell served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Service was accepted by Michael C. Griffin, Counsel. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Accordingly it is hereby: ORDERED that a conference shall be held on January 17, 2020 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1506 of the United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007 to consider any motions for appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel and for consolidation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the named plaintiff shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on each of the Defendants and file notice of such service on the docket. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/30/2019) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ira M. Press to RE-FILE Document No. #13 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): defendant name in the 'To' field on the summons request PDF (Credit Suisse (USA) Inc.) contains a typographical error; party name must appear exactly as it does on pleading caption (Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to UBS Securities LLC. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steven Katzman. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to SmileDirectClub, Inc.. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kyle Wailes. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc.. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jefferies LLC. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Katzman. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Camelot Venture Group. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BofA Securities, Inc.. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alexander Fenkell. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY -COMPLAINT against BofA Securities, Inc., Camelot Venture Group, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Alexander Fenkell, J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Jefferies LLC, David Katzman, Steven Katzman, SmileDirectClub, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Kyle Wailes. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification)(Press, Ira) Modified on 10/24/2019 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ira M. Press. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code XX Out of State. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Camelot Venture Group, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Press, Ira) Modified on 10/24/2019 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UBS Securities LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jefferies LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BofA Securities, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Citigroup Global Markets Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alexander Fenkell, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steven Katzman, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kyle Wailes, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Katzman, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SmileDirectClub, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Barry Ginsberg. (Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BofA Securities, Inc., Camelot Venture Group, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Alexander Fenkell, J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Jefferies LLC, David Katzman, Steven Katzman, SmileDirectClub, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Kyle Wailes. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17822291)Document filed by Barry Ginsberg.(Press, Ira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ginsberg v. SmileDirectClub, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies LLC
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Wailes
Represented By: Michael Charles Griffin
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Katzman
Represented By: Michael Charles Griffin
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SmileDirectClub, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Charles Griffin
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Katzman
Represented By: Michael Charles Griffin
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Fenkell
Represented By: Michael Charles Griffin
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities, LLC
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camelot Venture Group
Represented By: Michael Charles Griffin
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bofa Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Ginsberg
Represented By: Ira M. Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Derus
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: James A. Holifield, Jr.
Represented By: Laurence M. Rosen
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wei Wei
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: James A. Holifield, Jr.
Represented By: Laurence M. Rosen
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joe Stofko
Represented By: Ira M. Press
Represented By: Lesley F. Portnoy
Represented By: Casey E. Sadler
Represented By: Tara L. Swafford
Represented By: Robert V. Prongay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 1199 SEIU Health Care Employees Pension Fund
Represented By: Danielle S. Myers
Represented By: Christopher M. Wood
Represented By: Michael Albert
Represented By: Darren J. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Camelot Event Driven Fund
Represented By: Ira M. Press
Represented By: Lesley F. Portnoy
Represented By: Casey E. Sadler
Represented By: Tara L. Swafford
Represented By: Robert V. Prongay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: MICHAEL J MORSE
Represented By: Robert P. Bramlett
Represented By: Paul Kent Bramlett
Represented By: Michael J. Palestina
Represented By: Lewis S. Kahn
Represented By: Melinda A. Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?