Saenz v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Delfina Saenz
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01042
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company.(Wahlheim, William)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company answer due 1/14/2020. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/30/2019. (am)
December 19, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. (am)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE: The Department of Commerce and Insurance was served December 3, 2019, on behalf of Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company in connection with the above-styled proceeding. (am)
November 21, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for K. Cody Allison, Samuel D. Payne, Lauren W. Travis. (am)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 01:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company.(Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3035787), filed by Delfina Saenz. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saenz v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delfina Saenz
Represented By: Samuel D. Payne
Represented By: Lauren W. Travis
Represented By: K. Cody Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?