Americredit Financial Services, Inc. v. Lyons
Plaintiff: Americredit Financial Services, Inc.
Defendant: Richard K. Lyons
Case Number: 3:2019cv01045
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Amended Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 1/17/2020. (gb)
January 17, 2020 Filing 19 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. (Ronderos, Joseph)
January 17, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Richard K. Lyons.(Callen, Jason)
January 17, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason W. Callen on behalf of Richard K. Lyons (Callen, Jason)
January 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Welborn, III on behalf of Richard K. Lyons (Welborn, Joseph)
January 17, 2020 Filing 15 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically for Out-of-Town Counsel at Initial Case Management Conference by Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. (Ronderos, Joseph)
January 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically for Out-of-Town Counsel at Initial Case Management Conference by Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. (Ronderos, Joseph)
December 19, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Walter Woods Bussart. (dt)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #1 Complaint. Extension to 1/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 12/18/19. (dt)
December 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Richard K. Lyons. (Bussart, Walter)
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. Richard K. Lyons served on 12/5/2019. (Ronderos, Joseph)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Stephen P. Strohschein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/9/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #8 MOTION for attorney Stephen Strohschein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3045583). (Ronderos, Joseph)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Stephen Strohschein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3045583) by Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ronderos, Joseph)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/4/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Richard K. Lyons. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by Americredit Financial Services, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended and Restated Master Loan Agreement, #2 Exhibit Authorization, #3 Exhibit Continuing Guaranty Agreement, #4 Exhibit Revolving Line of Credit (Promissory Note), #5 Exhibit Notice of Default Letter, #6 Exhibit Forbearance Agreement and Voluntary Surrender, #7 Exhibit Letter Regarding Expiration of Forbearance Agreement, #8 Exhibit Current Schedule of SOT Vehicles)(Ronderos, Joseph)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (jm)
November 25, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#1 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. The exhibits shall be REFILED by filing a Notice of Filing and attaching the exhibits with the mandatory brief description. (EXAMPLE: Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Police Report dated 1/1/06, # 2 Exhibit 2 Unreported Case Smith v. Jones). (jm)
November 21, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Stephen P. Strohschein: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/12/2019. (jm)
November 21, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Joseph V. Ronderos, Jr., LA State Bar status verified as active for Stephen P. Strohschein. (jm)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard K. Lyons (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0650-3036157), filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Americredit Financial Services, Inc. v. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Americredit Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen P. Strohschein
Represented By: Joseph V. Ronderos, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard K. Lyons
Represented By: Joseph F. Welborn, III
Represented By: Jason W. Callen
Represented By: Walter Woods Bussart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?