Veith v. Tyson Fresh Meat, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Veith
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meat, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01065
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Joint filed by Jacquelyn Veith. (Collins, Heather)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tyson Fresh Meat, Inc.. (Sutton, Megan)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tyson Fresh Meat, Inc..(Sutton, Megan)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan M. Sutton on behalf of Tyson Fresh Meat, Inc. (Sutton, Megan)
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Weber on behalf of Tyson Fresh Meat, Inc. (Weber, Kenneth)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Tyson Fresh Meat, Inc. answer due 1/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/31/2019. (mg)
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Tyson Fresh Meat, Inc.. (Sutton, Megan)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Jacquelyn Veith. Tyson Fresh Meat, Inc. served on 12/13/2019. (Hunter, Anne)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Tyson Fresh Meat, Inc. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
November 27, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Heather M. Collins, Anne Hunter and Paige M. Lyle. (dt)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tyson Fresh Meat, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3040030), filed by Jacquelyn Veith. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veith v. Tyson Fresh Meat, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meat, Inc.
Represented By: Megan M. Sutton
Represented By: Kenneth A. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Veith
Represented By: Paige M. Lyle
Represented By: Heather M. Collins
Represented By: Anne Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?