Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT and Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01086
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER STAYING CASE: The Joint Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance Pending Arbitration (Docket No. #12 ) is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending further order of the court. The initial case management conference scheduled for February 10, 2020 is CONTINUED, and, within 30 days of the issuance of the Public Law Board's decision, the parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/22/2020. (mg)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Aaron Edelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 1/22/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
January 22, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher W. Cardwell, and Mary Taylor Gallagher. (mg)
January 22, 2020 D.C. Bar status verified as active for Richard S. Edelman, Aaron S. Edelman. (mg)
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT. (Hamilton, William)
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Taylor Gallagher on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Gallagher, Mary)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Cardwell, Christopher)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W. Cardwell on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Cardwell, Christopher)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Richard Edelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/12/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Richard Edelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3048550) by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT. (Attachments: #1 Attachment certificate of good standing)(Hamilton, William)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Aaron Edelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3048544) by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT. (Attachments: #1 Attachment certificate of good standing)(Hamilton, William)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 1:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to CSX Transportation, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
December 6, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Michael Hamilton: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 12/27/2019. (mg)
December 6, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard S. Edelman, and Aaron S. Edelman: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/27/2019. (mg)
December 6, 2019 D.C Bar status verified as active for Richard S. Edelman, Michael Hamilton. (mg)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSX Transportation, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3045104), filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - P7529-142 Award, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT
Represented By: Michael Hamilton
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Represented By: Aaron S. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Represented By: Aaron S. Edelman
Represented By: William Michael Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher W. Cardwell
Represented By: Mary Taylor Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?