Kenco Logistic Services, LLC v. Kids II, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kenco Logistic Services, LLC
Defendant: Kids II, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01129
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#7 : The Certificate of Good Standing must be from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court. The new certificate shall be filed within 10 days. (gb)
February 13, 2020 IL State Bar status verified as active for John F. Horvath. (gb)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney John Horvath to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Kenco Logistic Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Simmons, Scott)
February 6, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#7 : The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether disciplinary proceedings by any disciplinary authority, a finding of contempt or a sanction under 28 U.S.C. 1927 by any court, or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing such matters. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (Davies, Kirk)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney John Horvath to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3079525) by Kenco Logistic Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Lee, Charles)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Kids II, Inc. (gb)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kenco Logistic Services, LLC. (Lee, Charles)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2020 at 01:15 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (gb)
December 17, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Charles B. Lee and Scott E. Simmons. (gb)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kids II, Inc. (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-3050847), filed by Kenco Logistic Services, LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (A) Kenco Services Agreement, #2 Exhibit (B) First Amendment, #3 Exhibit (C) Second Amendment, #4 Exhibit (D) Third Amendment, #5 Exhibit (E) Fourth Amendment, #6 Exhibit (F) Fifth Amendment, #7 Exhibit (G) Letter, #8 Exhibit (H) Affidavit of Tiffany Castleberry, #9 Exhibit (H1) August 9 2019 Invoice, #10 Exhibit (H2) September 6 2019 Invoice, #11 Exhibit (H3) October 4, 2019 Invoice, #12 Exhibit (I) August 28 Letter, #13 Exhibit (J) October 2, Letter)(gb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2019: #14 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet) (gb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenco Logistic Services, LLC v. Kids II, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenco Logistic Services, LLC
Represented By: Charles B. Lee
Represented By: Scott E. Simmons
Represented By: John F. Horvath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kids II, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?