Pujol v. Icy Waters Seafood, LLC
Plaintiff: Mathieu Pujol
Defendant: Icy Waters Seafood, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01130
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mathieu Pujol (Liebowitz, Richard)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File file pro hac vice motion and seek local counsel. Motion GRANTED.Extension to 1/31/2020. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/8/2020. (am)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File file pro hac vice motion and seek local counsel by Mathieu Pujol. (Liebowitz, Richard)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2020 at 01:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
December 17, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard P. Liebowitz: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 1/7/2020. (am)
December 17, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard P. Liebowitz: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 1/7/2020. (am)
December 17, 2019 NY State Bar status verified as active for Richard P. Liebowitz. (am)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Icy Waters Seafood, LLC. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Icy Waters Seafood, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3051250), filed by Mathieu Pujol. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - the Photograph, #3 Exhibit B - Infringing Website)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pujol v. Icy Waters Seafood, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathieu Pujol
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icy Waters Seafood, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?