Middlebrooks v. Parker et al
Plaintiff: Donald Middlebrooks
Defendant: Tony Mays and Tony Parker
Case Number: 3:2019cv01139
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Scott C. Sutherland, Robert W. Mitchell, Charlotte M. Davis and Miranda H. Jones. (gb)
February 10, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Tony Mays, Tony Parker . (Sutherland, Scott)
February 10, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Tony Mays, Tony Parker. (Sutherland, Scott)
February 10, 2020 Filing 17 *** DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR *** MEMORANDUM in Support of #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Tony Mays, Tony Parker . (Sutherland, Scott) Modified on 2/10/2020 (gb).
February 10, 2020 Filing 16 *** DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR *** MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Tony Mays, Tony Parker. (Sutherland, Scott) Modified on 2/10/2020 (gb).
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendants' Motion to Dismiss ( #7 ) and Supplemental Motion to Dismiss ( #9 ). After the Motions were filed, Plaintiff filed an Amended Complaint ( #13 ). Accordingly, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss ( #7 ) and Supplemental Motion to Dismiss ( #9 ) are DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/30/2020. (gb)
January 29, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Donald Middlebrooks. (Henry, Kelley)
January 28, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Donald Middlebrooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 OLC Opinion)(Henry, Kelley)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #7 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/24/2020. (gb)
January 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Donald Middlebrooks. (Henry, Kelley)
January 14, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of #9 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Tony Mays, Tony Parker. (Sutherland, Scott)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Tony Mays, Tony Parker. (Sutherland, Scott)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Tony Mays, Tony Parker. (Sutherland, Scott)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Tony Mays, Tony Parker. (Sutherland, Scott)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM & ORDER Assessing Filing Fee ($350) for Kelley J. Henry. Counts 2, 3, and 4 are DISMISSED without prejudice to Plaintiff's ability to re-file them in the event that they become ripe for review. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading with respect to Count 1. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/8/2020. (xc: Warden of the Riverbend Maximum Security Institution by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed by Donald Middlebrooks. Tony Parker served on 12/19/2019. (Henry, Kelley)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed by Donald Middlebrooks. Tony Mays served on 12/19/2019. (Henry, Kelley)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Tony Mays, Tony Parker. (gb)
December 18, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kelley J. Henry. (gb)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Donald Middlebrooks. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Fee Waiver Application)(gb)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tony Mays, Tony Parker, filed by Donald Middlebrooks. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OLC Opinion, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Middlebrooks v. Parker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Mays
Represented By: Miranda H. Jones
Represented By: Charlotte M. Davis
Represented By: Scott C. Sutherland
Represented By: Robert W. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Parker
Represented By: Miranda H. Jones
Represented By: Charlotte M. Davis
Represented By: Scott C. Sutherland
Represented By: Robert W. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Middlebrooks
Represented By: Kelley J. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?