Tomelleri v. Decal Connection, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Defendant: Decal Connection, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01148
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference RESET for 4/15/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (gb)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference. The initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from February 19, 2019, to 11:00 a.m, Wednesday, April 15, 2020, in Courtroom No. 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 2/13/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
February 12, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Maguire, Oliver)
February 4, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph R. Tomelleri. Decal Connection, Inc. waiver sent on 1/31/2020. (Douglass, Scott)
January 30, 2020 Filing 10 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Douglass, Scott)
January 24, 2020 KS State Bar status verified as active for Oliver P. Maguire. (jw)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED for 3:30 p.m., February 19, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/16/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Oliver P. Maguire to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 1/13/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Oliver P. Maguire from the United States District Court for the District of Kansas filed by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Douglass, Scott)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Oliver P. Maguire to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3063671) by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Douglass, Scott)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (jw)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw)
January 2, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Scott McLean Douglass, Oliver P. Maguire: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U.S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 1/23/2020. (jw)
January 2, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Scott McLean Douglass; KS State Bar status verified as active for Oliver P. Maguire. (jw)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/29/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Decal Connection, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3054505), filed by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomelleri v. Decal Connection, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Represented By: Oliver P. Maguire
Represented By: Scott McLean Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decal Connection, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?