Sheet Metal Workers' Health and Welfare Fund of North Carolina v. Law Offices of Shane Smith, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers' Health and Welfare Fund of North Carolina
Defendant: Jane Arrowood, Darren K. Arrowood and Law Offices of Shane Smith, P.C.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00008
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Norris A. Kessler, III. (gb)
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Law Offices of Shane Smith, P.C.. (Kessler, Norris)
February 5, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Law Offices of Shane Smith, P.C..(Kessler, Norris)
February 5, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Darren K. Arrowood, Jane Arrowood. (Kessler, Norris) Modified text on 2/27/2020 (gb).
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Sheet Metal Workers' Health and Welfare Fund of North Carolina. Jane Arrowood served on 1/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Non-Military Service - Jane Arrowood)(Jennings, R.)
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Sheet Metal Workers' Health and Welfare Fund of North Carolina. Darren K. Arrowood served on 1/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Non-Military Service - Darren K. Arrowood)(Jennings, R.)
January 22, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Sheet Metal Workers' Health and Welfare Fund of North Carolina. Law Offices of Shane Smith, P.C. served on 1/14/2020. (Jennings, R.)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 1:15 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jw)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Darren K. Arrowood, Jane Arrowood, Law Offices of Shane Smith, P.C. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw)
January 6, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for R. Jan Jennings and Karla M. Campbell. (jw)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Darren K. Arrowood, Jane Arrowood, Law Offices of Shane Smith, P.C. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3059374), filed by Sheet Metal Workers' Health and Welfare Fund of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Article VII, Section 10, #3 Exhibit B - Executed Agreement [redacted])(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheet Metal Workers' Health and Welfare Fund of North Carolina v. Law Offices of Shane Smith, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers' Health and Welfare Fund of North Carolina
Represented By: Karla M. Campbell
Represented By: R. Jan Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Arrowood
Represented By: Norris A. Kessler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren K. Arrowood
Represented By: Norris A. Kessler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Shane Smith, P.C.
Represented By: Norris A. Kessler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?