Polk v. Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Plaintiff: Diane Polk
Defendant: Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00015
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Diane Polk. (McNamara, James)
March 4, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Diane Polk. (McNamara, James)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Publix Super Markets, Inc. of filing amended civil cover sheet (Parman, Steven)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Publix Super Markets, Inc..(Parman, Steven)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Publix Super Markets, Inc. amended notice of removal (Parman, Steven)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Parman, Steven)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Parman, Steven)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 1:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt)
January 8, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for James P. McNamara, Jason Gichner and Steven Douglas Parman. (dt)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Publix Super Markets, Inc. from Circuit Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 19C1806. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3061538) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - State Court Filings, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polk v. Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Polk
Represented By: Jason Gichner
Represented By: James P. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Douglas Parman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?