Smith v. Lowe's Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Eugene Smith
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc., John Doe and Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00020
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Spicer, Richard)
February 21, 2020 DISREGARD DE: 12 , FILED IN ERROR. (am)
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 (DISREGARD FILED IN ERROR)NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County Circuit, case number 2020-CV-1. Linda M. Bussard vs Jackson County, Tennessee; FEDERAL DIVISIONAL OFFICE: Northeastern; ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0650-3092208). (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Robyn Beale Williams, # 3 Exhibit B - Complaint, # 4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Kayla Cantrell)(Williams, Robyn) Modified on 2/21/2020 (am).
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey K. Walker terminated. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/21/2020. (vh)
February 21, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Benjamin K. Dean. (vh)
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Plaintiff by David Eugene Smith. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Dean, Benjamin)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 ***DISREGARD - FILED IN WRONG CASE OPENED IN NEW CASE 3:20-cv-119*** NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wilson County Chancery Court, case number 2020-cv-15. Paul Maas vs City of Mount Juliet; FEDERAL DIVISIONAL OFFICE: Nashville; (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0650-3083613). Attachments: # 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, Jeffrey) Modified text on 2/10/2020 (gb).
January 14, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Lindsey M. Shepard, Richard E. Spicer. (vh)
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc.. (Shepard, Lindsey)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/10/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Shepard, Lindsey)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(Shepard, Lindsey)
January 10, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Lindsey M. Shepard, Richard E. Spicer, Jeffrey K. Walker, William R. Underhill. (am)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC from Robertson County Circuit Court, case number 74CC1-2019-CV-380. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3062711) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Lowe's Home Center, #3 Exhibit B - Lowe's Companies)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Lowe's Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Richard E. Spicer
Represented By: Lindsey M. Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Richard E. Spicer
Represented By: Lindsey M. Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Eugene Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Walker
Represented By: William R. Underhill
Represented By: Benjamin K. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?