Beverage Dispensing Solutions, LLC v. Franke Coffee Systems North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Beverage Dispensing Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Franke Coffee Systems North America, Inc. and Franke Coffee Systems Americas LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00051
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Joseph Oldaker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 1/23/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Timothy Grochocinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 1/23/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/22/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
January 22, 2020 IL State Bar status verified as active for Timothy E. Grochocinski and Joseph P. Oldaker. (vh)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Joseph Oldaker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3070392) by Beverage Dispensing Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Prop. Or.)(Irion, Van)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Timothy Grochocinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3070377) by Beverage Dispensing Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Prop. Or., #2 Exhibit Cert. Good Standing)(Irion, Van)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/16/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (vh)
January 21, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Van R. Irion. (vh)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Beverage Dispensing Solutions, LLC. (vh)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Franke Coffee Systems North America, Inc. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail) (vh)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons issued as to Franke Coffee Systems Americas LLC. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail) (vh)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Franke Coffee Systems Americas LLC and Franke Coffee Systems North America, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3068747), filed by Beverage Dispensing Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Report of Patent Litigation, #2 Exhibit 1-Claims Charts 1, #3 Exhibit 2-Claims Charts 2, #4 Exhibit 3-Claims Charts 3, #5 Exhibit 4- Claims Charts 4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beverage Dispensing Solutions, LLC v. Franke Coffee Systems North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverage Dispensing Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Van R. Irion
Represented By: Timothy E. Grochocinski
Represented By: Joseph P. Oldaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franke Coffee Systems North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franke Coffee Systems Americas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?