Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. v. City of Clarksville, Tennessee
Plaintiff: Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.
Defendant: City of Clarksville, Tennessee
Case Number: 3:2020cv00068
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Garry K. Grooms and William L. Penny. (gb)
March 19, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by William L. Penny on behalf of City of Clarksville, Tennessee (Penny, William)
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Garry K. Grooms on behalf of City of Clarksville, Tennessee (Grooms, Garry)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: On March 12, 2020, Plaintiff filed a response ( #12 ) to the Court's order to show cause why this case should not be dismissed ( #9 ). Based on the statements in Plaintiff's response, the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED for May 14, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/17/2020. (xc:Garry K. Grooms by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
March 12, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jason D. Holleman. (gb)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. The Court construes Plaintiff's consent order as a motion for substitution of counsel and GRANTS the motion. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/12/2020. Added attorney Jason D. Holleman for Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. Attorney Andrea T. McKellar and Lyndsay C. Smith terminated. (gb)
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. (Martin, Mark)
March 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. (Martin, Mark)
March 11, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. City of Clarksville, Tennessee waiver sent on 3/5/2020. (Martin, Mark)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: This case was commenced by the filing of a complaint on January 24, 2020. (Docket No. 1.) On January 27, 2020, a notice was issued setting the initial case management conference for March 9, 2020, at 3:30 p.m. (Docket No. 5.) No counsel appeared at that date and time. By no later than March 20, 2020, Plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed under the Court's inherent authority for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute and under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f)(1)(A) for failure of Plaintiff's attorney to attend the initial case management conference. Failure to show good cause may result in dismissal of this action by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/10/2020. (am)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Mark E. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 1/29/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/27/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
January 27, 2020 Filing 6 Summons issued as to City of Clarksville, Tennessee. (gb)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (gb)
January 24, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Lyndsay C. Smith, Andrea T. McKellar and Elizabeth A. Alexander. AL State Bar status verified as active for Mark E. Martin. (gb)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Mark E. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3073234) by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(gb)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. (gb)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Clarksville, Tennessee (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-3073207), filed by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - November Notice, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. v. City of Clarksville, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Alexander
Represented By: Mark E. Martin
Represented By: Lyndsay C. Smith
Represented By: Andrea T. McKellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Clarksville, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?