Springer v. Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County acting by and through The Electric Powerboard of said Government
Plaintiff: Norma Springer
Defendant: Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County acting by and through The Electronic Powerboard of said Government and Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County acting by and through THE ELECTRIC POWERBOARD of said GOVERNMENT
Case Number: 3:2020cv00202
Filed: March 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 5/18/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/30/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
March 31, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for William A. Blue, Jr. (am)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County acting by and through The Electronic Powerboard of said Government.(Ricci, Mallory)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 3/10/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
March 9, 2020 AL State Bar status verified as active for Dustin J. Kittle. (Admitted in TNMD and TN Bar) (am)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, LLP on behalf of Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County acting by and through The Electronic Powerboard of said Government. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
March 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County acting by and through The Electronic Powerboard of said Government (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3102026), filed by Norma Springer. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge, #3 Exhibit B - Right to Sue)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Springer v. Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County acting by and through The Electric Powerboard of said Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County acting by and through The Electronic Powerboard of said Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County acting by and through THE ELECTRIC POWERBOARD of said GOVERNMENT
Represented By: Mallory Schneider Ricci
Represented By: William A. Blue, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Springer
Represented By: Dustin J. Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?