Hines Furlong Line, Inc. et al
In Re: Hines Furlong Line, Inc., HFL Fleeting, LLC and Marathon Petroleum Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00217
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 46:30501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION Order Approving Security, Directing Issuance of Notice, and Restraining Suits Pursuant to Rule F by HFL Fleeting, LLC, Hines Furlong Line, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kent E. Furlong Regarding Value of Motor Vessel DONNA H. FURLONG, #2 Exhibit B - Letter of Undertaking, #3 Exhibit C - Ad Interim Stipulation and Bond for Limitation Fund, #4 Exhibit D - Proposed Order Approving Security for Vessel, Directing Issuance of Notice, and Restraining Suits, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Complaint for Exoneration From, or Limitation of, Liability)(Curtis, Jacob)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Christopher G. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 4/22/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
April 20, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Katharine B. Fischman, and KY State Bar status verified as active for Christopher G. Johnson. (mg)
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Christopher G. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3125870) by Marathon Petroleum Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Fischman, Katharine)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Katharine B. Fischman on behalf of Marathon Petroleum Company (Fischman, Katharine)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg) (Main Document 10 replaced on 4/8/2020) (mg).
April 8, 2020 Filing 9 ***DISREGARD*** NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg) Modified on 4/8/2020 (mg).
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 4/8/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HFL Fleeting, LLC. (Nienhuis, Robert)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hines Furlong Line, Inc.. (Nienhuis, Robert)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Robert Nienhuis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 3/13/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
March 12, 2020 MO State Bar status verified as active for Robert Nienhuis. (mg)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for attorney Robert Nienhuis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3105546) by Hines Furlong Line, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Nienhuis, Robert)
March 12, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Robert Nienhuis: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 4/2/2020. (mg)
March 12, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jacob D. Curtis. (mg)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN ADMIRALTY filed by Hines Furlong Line, Inc., HFL Fleeting, LLC.(Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3105359) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) Modified on 3/12/2020 (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hines Furlong Line, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Hines Furlong Line, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Nienhuis
Represented By: Jacob D. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: HFL Fleeting, LLC
Represented By: Robert Nienhuis
Represented By: Jacob D. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Marathon Petroleum Company
Represented By: Christopher G. Johnson
Represented By: Katharine B. Fischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?