Gilinsky v. Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services of Seattle, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jamy Gilinsky
Defendant: Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services of Seattle, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00261
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial is set for 9/21/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 873 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Pretrial Conference is set for 9/17/2021 at 01:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Exhibit List due by 9/14/2021. Witness List due by 9/14/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/14/2021. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/21/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/25/2020. Discovery due by 3/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2021. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/21/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
May 21, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 5/21/2020. (Hearing lasted :10)(kb)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for May 21, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. is RESET for the same day at 2:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/19/2020. (vh)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services of Seattle, Inc.. (Harris, Jonathan)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Given present health concerns, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for May 21, 2020 shall be held by telephone. Lead counsel for each party shall participate in the conference. Judge Trauger's Courtroom Deputy will email to counsel the number they should call in order to participate in the conference. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/14/2020. (vh)
April 21, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jonathan O. Harris and Benjamin P. Lemly. (vh)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services of Seattle, Inc.. (Harris, Jonathan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services of Seattle, Inc..(Harris, Jonathan)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 2:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt)
March 30, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for G. Brandon Hall and Curt M. Masker. (dt)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons issued as to Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services of Seattle, Inc. (Service copies returned to counsel.) (dt)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services of Seattle, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3114204), filed by Jamy Gilinsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilinsky v. Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services of Seattle, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services of Seattle, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan O. Harris
Represented By: Benjamin P. Lemly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamy Gilinsky
Represented By: G. Brandon Hall
Represented By: Curt M. Masker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?