Country Mutual Insurance Company v. R.G. Anderson Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Country Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: R.G. Anderson Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00301
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 6/9/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 6/5/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Joint filed by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Anderson, John)
May 29, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by R.G. Anderson Company, Inc.(Broy, Joseph) Modified on 6/1/2020 (vh).
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer R.G. Anderson Company, Inc. answer due 5/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 5/4/2020. (am)
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by R.G. Anderson Company, Inc. (Broy, Joseph) Modified on 5/4/2020 (vh).
April 30, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Joseph L. Broy. (vh)
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph L. Broy on behalf of R.G. Anderson Company, Inc. (Broy, Joseph)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/10/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (vh)
April 10, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for John E. Anderson. (vh)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to R.G. Anderson Company, Inc.(service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (vh)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh)
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against R.G. Anderson Company, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3121258), filed by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Business Disclosure Statement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Country Mutual Insurance Company v. R.G. Anderson Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Country Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: John E. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.G. Anderson Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph L. Broy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?