Walker v. Laboratory Corporation of America
Plaintiff: Bridget B. Walker
Defendant: Laboratory Corporation of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00343
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/3/2020 at 03:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Joint Motion to Reset Initial Case Management Conference. Motion GRANTED. ICMC reset for 8/3/20 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/11/2020. (am)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Bridget B. Walker. (Nelson, Jesse)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for June 19, 2020 is hereby RESET for Wednesday, June 24, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. and shall be held by telephone conference. Lead counsel for each party shall participate in the conference. Judge Trauger's Courtroom Deputy will email to counsel the number they should call in order to participate in the conference. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/29/2020. (am)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Reissued as to Laboratory Corporation of America. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
May 12, 2020 Summons reissued due to the first set being sent to the wrong address. The attorney's addressed has been updated in the system. (am)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 Regular Mail Returned to Sender, Attempted, Not Known, Unable to Forward. #4 Notice of Case Management Conference, #5 Summons Issued. Mail sent to Jesse D. Nelson. (am)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Laboratory Corporation of America. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2020 at 01:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
April 23, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jesse D. Nelson. (am)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Laboratory Corporation of America (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3129272), filed by Bridget B. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Laboratory Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laboratory Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget B. Walker
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?