Usherson v. Third Man Records, LLC
Plaintiff: Arthur Usherson
Defendant: Third Man Records, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00390
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw Pro Hac Vice Motion. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 7/1/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
June 30, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw Document pro hac vice motion by Arthur Usherson. (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 25, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#11 : The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether disciplinary proceedings by any disciplinary authority, a finding of contempt or a sanction under 28 U.S.C. 1927 by any court, or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing such matters. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (Davies, Kirk)
June 25, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for James R. Wiggington. (vh)
June 25, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#11 : The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether disciplinary proceedings by any disciplinary authority, a finding of contempt or a sanction under 28 U.S.C. 1927 by any court, or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing such matters. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (vh)
June 24, 2020 Filing 11 ***WITHDRAWN PER DE 13*** MOTION for attorney Richard Liebowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3165209) by Arthur Usherson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing)(Liebowitz, Richard) Modified on 7/1/2020 (vh).
June 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Wiggington on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wiggington, James)
June 12, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Chris L. Vlahos. (vh)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Third Man Records, LLC.(Vlahos, Chris)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Pro Hac Motion and Associate with Local Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 5/28/2020. (vh)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pro Hac Vice Motion and Associate with Local Counsel by Arthur Usherson. (Liebowitz, Richard)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 5/6/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (vh)
May 6, 2020 NY State Bar status verified as active for Richard P. Liebowitz. (vh)
May 6, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard P. Liebowitz: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 5/27/2020. (vh)
May 6, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard P. Liebowitz: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 5/27/2020. (vh)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Third Man Records, LLC. (service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (vh)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Third Man Records, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3136024), filed by Arthur Usherson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-The Photograph, #2 Exhibit B-Infringement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Usherson v. Third Man Records, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Usherson
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Third Man Records, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?